EP3325932 - CAPACITIVE CYLINDER PRESSURE SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | 06.09.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teknologian tutkimuskeskus VTT Oy Tekniikantie 21 02150 Espoo / FI | [2024/41] |
Former [2018/22] | For all designated states Teknologian tutkimuskeskus VTT Oy Vuorimiehentie 3 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SILLANPÄÄ, Teuvo 02150 Espoo / FI | 02 /
KOPPINEN, Panu 02150 Espoo / FI | 03 /
ELERS, Kai-Erik 02150 Espoo / FI | [2024/40] |
Former [2018/22] | 01 /
SILLANPÄÄ, Teuvo c/o Teknologian tutkimuskeskus VTT Oy P.O. Box 1000 02044 VTT / FI | ||
02 /
KOPPINEN, Panu c/o Teknologian tutkimuskeskus VTT Oy P.O. Box 1000 02044 VTT / FI | |||
03 /
ELERS, Kai-Erik c/o Teknologian tutkimuskeskus VTT Oy P.O. Box 1000 02044 VTT / FI | Representative(s) | Kolster Oy Ab (Salmisaarenaukio 1) P.O. Box 204 00181 Helsinki / FI | [2018/22] | Application number, filing date | 16739512.8 | 19.07.2016 | [2018/22] | WO2016EP67161 | Priority number, date | US201514805478 | 22.07.2015 Original published format: US201514805478 | [2018/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017013109 | Date: | 26.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3325932 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3325932 | Date: | 09.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01L9/00 | [2018/22] | CPC: |
G01L9/0072 (EP,US);
G01M15/08 (US);
G01L23/12 (US);
G01L23/125 (US);
G01L9/0005 (US);
G01L9/0033 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KAPAZITIVER ZYLINDERDRUCKSENSOR | [2018/22] | English: | CAPACITIVE CYLINDER PRESSURE SENSOR | [2018/22] | French: | DÉTECTEUR DE PRESSION DE CYLINDRE CAPACITIF | [2018/22] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/22] | 16.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4382377 (KLEINSCHMIDT PETER [DE], et al); | [A]JPH10111206 (DENSO CORP); | [XI]DE102012112920 (BD SENSORS GMBH [DE]) |