EP3249026 - SINTERED PHOSPHOR, LIGHT EMITTING DEVICE, ILLUMINATION DEVICE, VEHICLE HEADLAMP, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SINTERED PHOSPHOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | [2017/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASAMI, Harumi c/o MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORPORATION 1-1,Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1008251 / JP | 02 /
MIYAMOTO, Yukihiro c/o MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORPORATION,1-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1008251 / JP | 03 /
SOMA, Minoru c/o MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORPORATION 1-1,Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1008251 / JP | 04 /
KATSUMOTO, Tadahiro c/o MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORPORATION 1-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | 05 /
HORIBE, Kentarou c/o MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORPORATION 1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1008251 / JP | [2017/48] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2017/48] | Application number, filing date | 16740230.4 | 20.01.2016 | [2017/48] | WO2016JP51615 | Priority number, date | JP20150009736 | 21.01.2015 Original published format: JP 2015009736 | JP20150064864 | 26.03.2015 Original published format: JP 2015064864 | [2017/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016117623 | Date: | 28.07.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3249026 | Date: | 29.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3249026 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.07.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C09K11/64, C09K11/79, F21V3/04, H01L33/50, F21Y115/10, C09K11/02, B60Q1/04, F21S41/141, F21S41/151, F21V9/38, F21S41/20, F21V9/40 | [2023/29] | CPC: |
C09K11/02 (EP,KR,US);
B60Q1/04 (KR,US);
C09K11/08 (KR);
C09K11/0883 (EP,KR,US);
C09K11/77067 (KR);
C09K11/77068 (KR);
C09K11/77347 (KR);
C09K11/77348 (EP,KR,US);
C09K11/7774 (EP,US);
C09K11/77747 (EP,KR,US);
C09K11/77748 (KR);
F21S41/141 (EP,KR,US);
F21S41/151 (EP,KR,US);
F21S41/285 (EP,KR,US);
F21V3/04 (EP,KR,US);
F21V9/30 (KR,US);
F21V9/38 (EP,KR,US);
F21V9/40 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/05] | C09K11/64, C09K11/79, F21V3/04, H01L33/50, F21Y115/10, C09K11/02, F21V9/16, F21S8/10, B60Q1/04 | ||
Former IPC [2017/48] | C09K11/00, C09K11/02, C09K11/08, C09K11/64, C09K11/79, F21V3/04, H01L33/50, F21Y115/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GESINTERTER LEUCHTSTOFF, LICHTEMITTIERENDE VORRICHTUNG, BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG, FAHRZEUGSCHEINWERFER UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES GESINTERTEN LEUCHTSTOFFS | [2017/48] | English: | SINTERED PHOSPHOR, LIGHT EMITTING DEVICE, ILLUMINATION DEVICE, VEHICLE HEADLAMP, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SINTERED PHOSPHOR | [2017/48] | French: | LUMINOPHORE FRITTÉ, DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT, DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE, PHARE DE VÉHICULE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE LUMINOPHORE FRITTÉ | [2017/48] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2017 | Translation filed | 09.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2017 | Search fee paid | 09.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/48] | 09.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 24.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.11.2023 | CZ | 29.11.2023 | DK | 29.11.2023 | EE | 29.11.2023 | ES | 29.11.2023 | HR | 29.11.2023 | IT | 29.11.2023 | LT | 29.11.2023 | LV | 29.11.2023 | MC | 29.11.2023 | NL | 29.11.2023 | PL | 29.11.2023 | RO | 29.11.2023 | RS | 29.11.2023 | SE | 29.11.2023 | SK | 29.11.2023 | SM | 29.11.2023 | LU | 20.01.2024 | BG | 29.02.2024 | NO | 29.02.2024 | GR | 01.03.2024 | IS | 29.03.2024 | PT | 01.04.2024 | [2024/43] |
Former [2024/40] | AT | 29.11.2023 | |
CZ | 29.11.2023 | ||
DK | 29.11.2023 | ||
EE | 29.11.2023 | ||
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
IT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
MC | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RO | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SK | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | AT | 29.11.2023 | |
CZ | 29.11.2023 | ||
DK | 29.11.2023 | ||
EE | 29.11.2023 | ||
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
IT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RO | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SK | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 29.11.2023 | |
CZ | 29.11.2023 | ||
DK | 29.11.2023 | ||
EE | 29.11.2023 | ||
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RO | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | DK | 29.11.2023 | |
EE | 29.11.2023 | ||
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | DK | 29.11.2023 | |
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 29.11.2023 | |
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 01.03.2024 | |
IS | 29.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]JP2004161871 (NICHIA KAGAKU KOGYO KK) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0018] , [0029] , [0031] , [0036] * [Y] 7,9-15 [I] 8; | [IY]US2014239228 (ISHIZAWA HITOSHI [JP]) [I] 1-8 * paragraph [0185]; claims 1-19 *[Y] 9-15; | [XY]DE102013205329 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-6,8 * paragraphs [0011] , [0 13] , [0 21] , [0 60]; example 1; claims 1-15 * [Y] 7,9-15 | International search | [A]JP2003292946 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-18 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2006117876 (KONICA MINOLTA MED & GRAPHIC) [A] 1-18 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [X]JP2008053545 (NICHIA KAGAKU KOGYO KK) [X] 1-18 * , claims; paragraphs [0075] to [0087], [0116]; fig. 1 to 5 (Family: none) *; | [X]JP2008060428 (NICHIA KAGAKU KOGYO KK) [X] 1-18 * , claims; paragraphs [0084] to [0096], [0121]; fig. 1 to 8 (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2009154193 (NIKON CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-18 * , entire text & JP 5454473 B *; | [A]WO2013073592 (NIKON CORP [JP]) [A] 1-18 * , entire text & US 2014/0239228 A1 entire text & CN 103930386 A *; | [A]WO2014046173 (SUMITOMO OSAKA CEMENT CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-18 * , entire text & JP 5748028 B & US 2015/0299566 A1 entire text & CN 104471729 A *; | [A]JP2014145012 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [A] 1-18 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2014172940 (NEMOTO LUMI MATERIALS CO LTD) [A] 1-18* , entire text (Family: none) * |