EP3247933 - COMPOSITE REINFORCEMENT SYSTEMS AND METHODS OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.10.2019 [2019/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEPTUNE RESEARCH, LLC 3875 Fiscal Court Suite 100 Riviera Beach FL 33404 / US | [2017/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAZZARA, Christopher J. 272 Queens Lane Palm Beach, Florida 33480 / US | 02 /
LAZZARA, Richard J. 318 Arabian Road Palm Beach, Florida 33480 / US | 03 /
MINNIKANTI, Venkatachala S. 4793 South Citation Drive Apt. 205 Delray Beach, Florida 33445 / US | 04 /
FENOLI, Christopher R. 1737 Carvelle Drive Riviera Beach, Florida 33404 / US | 05 /
PEGUERO, Davie 11815 59th St N West Palm Beach, FL 33411 / US | [2018/11] |
Former [2017/48] | 01 /
LAZZARA, Christopher J. 272 Queens Lane Palm Beach, Florida 33480 / US | ||
02 /
LAZZARA, Richard J. 318 Arabian Road Palm Beach, Florida 33480 / US | |||
03 /
MINNIKANTI, Venkatachala S. 4793 South Citation Drive Apt. 205 Delray Beach, Florida 33445 / US | |||
04 /
FENOLI, Christopher R. 1737 Carvelle Drive Riviera Beach, Florida 33404 / US | |||
05 /
PEGUERO, Davie 1145 Lakeshore Drive Apt. 101 Lake Park, Florida 33403 / US | Representative(s) | Guardian IP Consulting I/S Diplomvej, Building 381 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | [2017/48] | Application number, filing date | 16740671.9 | 20.01.2016 | [2017/48] | WO2016US14115 | Priority number, date | US201562106629P | 22.01.2015 Original published format: US 201562106629 P | US201562195560P | 22.07.2015 Original published format: US 201562195560 P | [2017/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016118617 | Date: | 28.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3247933 | Date: | 29.11.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.07.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F16L55/16, F16L55/168, F16L55/18, F16L58/10, B29C73/10 | [2018/43] | CPC: |
B29C73/10 (EP,US);
B65B31/006 (US);
F16L55/1686 (EP,US);
B29C65/485 (US);
B29C65/5014 (US);
B29C70/202 (US);
B29C70/226 (US);
B29K2063/00 (EP,US);
B29K2075/00 (EP,US);
B29K2105/089 (EP,US);
B29K2307/04 (US);
B29K2309/08 (US);
B32B2260/021 (US);
B32B2260/023 (US);
B32B2260/046 (US);
B32B2262/101 (US);
B32B2262/106 (US);
B32B5/26 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/48] | F16L55/16, F16L55/168, F16L55/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/48] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENGESETZTE VERSTÄRKUNGSSYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2017/48] | English: | COMPOSITE REINFORCEMENT SYSTEMS AND METHODS OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME | [2017/48] | French: | SYSTÈMES DE RENFORT COMPOSITES ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION | [2017/48] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2017 | Search fee paid | 18.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/48] | 21.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/42] | 31.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2002106464 (BAZINET STEVE R [US]) [X] 11 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0041] * * figure 1 * [Y] 6-10[I] 12-15; | [XYI]WO2014196607 (KANEKA CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * claim - * * see EP 3 006 478 A1 * [Y] 6-10 [I] 3-5; | [E]EP3006478 (KANEKA CORP [JP]) [E] 1,2 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0053] * | International search | [A]US4519856 (LAZZARA RICHARD J [US]) [A] 1-95 * See abstract, column 1, line 35 - column 2, line 42, and figures 1-2. *; | [A]US5726222 (SAWAOKA RYUJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-95* See abstract and claims 1-18. *; | [A]US5786437 (NICHOLAS PAUL PETER [US]) [A] 1-95 * See abstract and claims 1-2. *; | [X]EP1028095 (TOHO RAYON KK [JP]) [X] 1-95 * See abstract, paragraphs [0047], [0099]-[0108], [0330]-[0337], and claims 1-10. *; | [A]US6386236 (BUCKLEY DAVID L [US]) [A] 1-95 * See abstract, column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 25, and figure 1. * |