EP3248011 - NMR METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR THE RAPID DETECTION OF TICK-BORNE PATHOGENS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.10.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee | 30.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states T2 Biosystems, Inc. 101 Hartwell Avenue Lexington, Massachusetts 02421 / US | [2018/03] |
Former [2017/48] | For all designated states T2 Biosystems, Inc. 101 Hartwell Avenue Lexington, Massachusetts 02421 / US | ||
For all designated states Townsend, Jessica Ann 47 Iffley Road Apartment 1 Boston, MA 02130 / US | |||
For all designated states Snyder, Jessica Lee 46 Thomdike Street Arlington, MA 02474 / US | |||
For all designated states Giese, Heidi Susanne 6 Woodman Way Apt 202 Newburyport, MA 01950 / US | |||
For all designated states Bandoski-Cralinski, Cheryl Ann 192 Kennedy Drive 808 Malden, MA 02148 / US | |||
For all designated states Logan, Daniella Lynn 62 Crocker Neck Road Cotuit, MA 02635 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOWNSEND, Jessica, Ann 47 Iffley Road Apartment 1 Boston, MA 02130 / US | 02 /
SNYDER, Jessica, Lee 30 Union Street Woburn, Massachusetts 01801 / US | 03 /
GIESE, Heidi, Susanne 6 Woodman Way Apt 202 Newburyport, MA 01950 / US | 04 /
BANDOSKI-GRALINSKI, Cheryl, Ann 192 Kennedy Drive 808 Malden, MA 02148 / US | 05 /
LOGAN, Daniella, Lynn 62 Crockers Neck Road Cotuit, MA 02635 / US | 06 /
THOMANN, Ulrich, Hans 128 South Acton Road Stow, MA 01775 / US | 07 /
NEELY, Lori, Anne 129 Green Street Reading, MA 01867 / US | 08 /
DHANDA, Rahul, Krishan 69 Richmond Street Dorchester, MA 02124 / US | 09 /
SWEENEY, Frederic 126 Union Street Natick, MA 01760 / US | 10 /
LOWERY, Thomas, Jay, Jr. 123 Winter Street Belmont, MA 02478 / US | [2019/25] |
Former [2017/48] | 01 /
TOWNSEND, Jessica, Ann 47 Iffley Road Apartment 1 Boston, MA 02130 / US | ||
02 /
SNYDER, Jessica, Lee 46 Thomdike Street Arlington, MA 02474 / US | |||
03 /
GIESE, Heidi, Susanne 6 Woodman Way Apt 202 Newburyport, MA 01950 / US | |||
04 /
BANDOSKI-GRALINSKI, Cheryl, Ann 192 Kennedy Drive 808 Malden, MA 02148 / US | |||
05 /
LOGAN, Daniella, Lynn 62 Crockers Neck Road Cotuit, MA 02635 / US | |||
06 /
THOMANN, Ulrich, Hans 128 South Acton Road Stow, MA 01775 / US | |||
07 /
NEELY, Lori, Anne 129 Green Street Reading, MA 01867 / US | |||
08 /
DHANDA, Rahul, Krishan 69 Richmond Street Dorchester, MA 02124 / US | |||
09 /
SWEENEY, Frederic 126 Union Street Natick, MA 01760 / US | |||
10 /
LOWERY, Thomas, Jay, Jr. 123 Winter Street Belmont, MA 02478 / US | Representative(s) | Simmons & Simmons LLP (Munich), et al Lehel Carré Thierschplatz 6 80538 Munich / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/48] | Bösl, Raphael Konrad Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 68 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16740774.1 | 21.01.2016 | [2017/48] | WO2016US14348 | Priority number, date | US201562106093P | 21.01.2015 Original published format: US 201562106093 P | [2017/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2016118766 | Date: | 28.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3248011 | Date: | 29.11.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.09.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/554, C07H21/04 | [2017/48] | CPC: |
C12Q1/689 (EP,US);
C12N15/1013 (US);
G01N24/08 (US);
C12Q2600/112 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/124 (US);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/48] | Title | German: | NMR-VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR SCHNELLEN DETEKTION VON DURCH ZECKEN ÜBERTRAGENEN PATHOGENEN | [2017/48] | English: | NMR METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR THE RAPID DETECTION OF TICK-BORNE PATHOGENS | [2017/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES DE RMN POUR LA DÉTECTION RAPIDE DE PATHOGÈNES TRANSMIS PAR LES TIQUES | [2017/48] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2017 | Search fee paid | 10.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/48] | 10.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2024 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   30.07.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2013244238 (NEELY LORI ANNE [US], et al); | International search | [XY]WO2004005479 (UNIV ARIZONA [US], et al); | [Y]US2012164644 (NEELY LORI ANNE [US], et al); | by applicant | US4683195 | US4683202 | WO8810315 | EP0320308 | US4965188 | US5130238 | US5210015 | US5310652 | US5322770 | US5352778 | US5399491 | US5407800 | US5427930 | US5455166 | US5457027 | US5500363 | US5538848 | US5804383 | US5876930 | US6030787 | US6258569 | US6410278 | US6951722 | US6974670 | US2006160084 | US7175985 | US2007190531 | US7462475 | US2009042197 | WO2012054639 | US2013244238 |