Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10695850 | Global Dossier | 30.06.2020 | B2 | US2018200814 | 19.07.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102015111663 | 17.07.2015 | WO2016EP67038 | 18.07.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107848050B | Global Dossier | 26.07.2019 | B | CN107848050 | 27.03.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102015111663 | 17.07.2015 | WO2016EP67038 | 18.07.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3325203 | Global Dossier | 25.08.2021 | B1 | EP3325203 | 30.05.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102015111663 | 17.07.2015 | WO2016EP67038 | 18.07.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017013056 | Global Dossier | 26.01.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102015111663 | 17.07.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102015111663 | 19.01.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102015111663 | 17.07.2015 |