Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10439244 | Global Dossier | 08.10.2019 | B2 | US2019006691 | 03.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP67431 | 21.07.2016 | DE102015214520 | 30.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107925108B | Global Dossier | 30.10.2020 | B | CN107925108 | 17.04.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP67431 | 21.07.2016 | DE102015214520 | 30.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3329535 | Global Dossier | 08.01.2020 | B1 | EP3329535 | 06.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP67431 | 21.07.2016 | DE102015214520 | 30.07.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017016980 | Global Dossier | 02.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102015214520 | 30.07.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102015214520 | 02.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102015214520 | 30.07.2015 |