EP3319955 - 6-AMINO-QUINOLINE-3-CARBONITRILS AS COT MODULATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gilead Sciences, Inc. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA 94404 / US | [2018/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BACON, Elizabeth, M. c/o Gilead Sciences Inc. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 02 /
BALAN, Gayatri c/o Gilead Sciences Inc. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 03 /
CHOU, Chien-hung c/o Gilead Sciences Inc. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 04 /
CLARK, Christopher, T. c/o Gilead Sciences Inc. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 05 /
COTTELL, Jeromy, J. c/o Gilead Sciences Inc. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 06 /
KIM, Musong c/o Gilead Sciences Inc. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 07 /
KIRSCHBERG, Thorsten, A. c/o Gilead Sciences Inc. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 08 /
LINK, John, O. c/o Gilead Sciences Inc. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 09 /
PHILLIPS, Gary c/o Gilead Sciences Inc. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 10 /
SCHROEDER, Scott, D. c/o Gilead Sciences Inc. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 11 /
SQUIRES, Neil, H. c/o Gilead Sciences Inc. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 12 /
STEVENS, Kirk, L. c/o Gilead Sciences Inc. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 13 /
TAYLOR, James, G. c/o Gilead Sciences Inc. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 14 /
WATKINS, William, J. c/o Gilead Sciences Inc. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 15 /
WRIGHT, Nathan, E. c/o Gilead Sciences Inc. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 16 /
ZIPFEL, Sheila, M. c/o Gilead Sciences Inc. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA 94404 / US | [2018/20] | Representative(s) | Schnappauf, Georg ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [2018/20] | Application number, filing date | 16741446.5 | 30.06.2016 | [2018/20] | WO2016US40552 | Priority number, date | US201562189155P | 06.07.2015 Original published format: US 201562189155 P | US201562269061P | 17.12.2015 Original published format: US 201562269061 P | [2018/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017007694 | Date: | 12.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3319955 | Date: | 16.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3319955 | Date: | 25.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/12, C07D401/14, C07D405/14, A61K31/4709, A61P29/00, A61P35/00, A61P37/00 | [2018/20] | CPC: |
C07D401/12 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4192 (KR);
A61K31/4725 (KR);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P11/08 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/06 (EP);
A61P21/04 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP,KR);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP,KR);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/50 (EP);
A61P7/04 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
C07D405/14 (EP,KR,US);
C07D409/14 (EP,US);
C07D413/12 (EP,KR,US);
C07D413/14 (EP,US);
C07D417/14 (EP,KR,US);
C07D453/02 (EP,KR,US);
C07F7/0814 (KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/20] | Extension states | BA | 05.02.2018 | ME | 05.02.2018 | Validation states | MA | 05.02.2018 | MD | 05.02.2018 | Title | German: | 6-AMINO-QUINOLINE-3-CARBONITRILDERIVATE ALS COT MODULATOREN | [2020/23] | English: | 6-AMINO-QUINOLINE-3-CARBONITRILS AS COT MODULATORS | [2018/20] | French: | DERIVES DE 6-AMINO-QUINOLINE-3-CARBONITRILE COMME DES MODULATEURS DE COT | [2020/23] |
Former [2018/20] | 6-AMINO-CHINOLIN-3-CARBONITRILE ALS COT-MODULATOREN | ||
Former [2018/20] | 6-AMINO-QUINOLINE-3-CARBONITRILES UTILISÉS COMME MODULATEURS DE LA KINASE COT | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/20] | 05.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.10.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 26.08.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.06.2016 | AL | 25.11.2020 | CY | 25.11.2020 | DK | 25.11.2020 | EE | 25.11.2020 | FI | 25.11.2020 | HR | 25.11.2020 | LT | 25.11.2020 | LV | 25.11.2020 | MC | 25.11.2020 | MK | 25.11.2020 | MT | 25.11.2020 | RO | 25.11.2020 | RS | 25.11.2020 | SM | 25.11.2020 | BG | 25.02.2021 | IS | 25.03.2021 | LU | 30.06.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 30.06.2016 | |
AL | 25.11.2020 | ||
CY | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
MK | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
LU | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 30.06.2016 | |
AL | 25.11.2020 | ||
CY | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
LU | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
CY | 25.11.2020 | ||
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
LU | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
LU | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
MC | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 25.11.2020 | |
DK | 25.11.2020 | ||
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | DK | 25.11.2020 | |
EE | 25.11.2020 | ||
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | EE | 25.11.2020 | |
FI | 25.11.2020 | ||
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 25.11.2020 | |
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
RO | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 25.11.2020 | |
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LT | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | FI | 25.11.2020 | |
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
SM | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | FI | 25.11.2020 | |
HR | 25.11.2020 | ||
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | FI | 25.11.2020 | |
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
IS | 25.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | FI | 25.11.2020 | |
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
BG | 25.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 25.11.2020 | |
LV | 25.11.2020 | ||
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 25.11.2020 | |
RS | 25.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 25.11.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2006124692 (WYETH CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-48 * see the preferred compounds and especially all examples as inhibitors of TPL2 kinase *; | [A] - RAKESH K GOYAL ET AL, "Models for anti-inflammatory activity of 8-substituted-4-anilino-6-aminoquinoline-3-carbonitriles", MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY RESEARCH, BIRKHÄUSER-VERLAG, BOSTON, (20110319), vol. 21, no. 7, doi:10.1007/S00044-011-9613-5, ISSN 1554-8120, pages 1044 - 1055, XP035060999 [A] 1-48 * see the compounds of table 1 as inhibitors of TPL2 kinase * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00044-011-9613-5 |