EP3314868 - EXCHANGING DATA WITH A LASER OR A MACHINE TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/18] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR EXCHANGING DATA WITH A LASER OR A MACHINE TOOL | ||
[2022/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.12.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRUMPF Werkzeugmaschinen SE + Co. KG Johann-Maus-Straße 2 71254 Ditzingen / DE | [2023/14] |
Former [2018/18] | For all designated states Trumpf Werkzeugmaschinen GmbH + Co. KG Johann-Maus-Strasse 2 71254 Ditzingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUER, Klaus Konrad-Kocher-Strasse 11 71254 Ditzingen / DE | 02 /
BOCK, Hans-Peter Königsberger Str. 15 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | 03 /
GÖRG, Christian Strombergstr. 8 71696 Möglingen / DE | [2018/22] |
Former [2018/18] | 01 /
BAUER, Klaus Konrad-Kocher-Strasse 11 71254 Ditzingen / DE | ||
02 /
BOCK, Hans-Peter Pappelweg 10/1 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | |||
03 /
GÖRG, Christian Wartbergstrasse 6 71696 Moeglingen / DE | Representative(s) | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Gropiusplatz 10 70563 Stuttgart / DE | [2018/18] | Application number, filing date | 16741869.8 | 24.06.2016 | [2018/18] | WO2016EP64658 | Priority number, date | DE201510212074 | 29.06.2015 Original published format: DE102015212074 | [2018/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017001295 | Date: | 05.01.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3314868 | Date: | 02.05.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3314868 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04L67/12, H04L67/568 | [2022/50] | CPC: |
H04L67/34 (EP,CN,US);
H04L67/12 (EP,CN,US);
H04L67/568 (EP,CN,US);
G05B19/18 (US);
G06F21/105 (US)
|
Former IPC [2018/18] | H04L29/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DATENAUSTAUSCH MIT EINEM LASER ODER EINER WERKZEUGMASCHINE | [2022/50] | English: | EXCHANGING DATA WITH A LASER OR A MACHINE TOOL | [2022/50] | French: | ÉCHANGE DE DONNÉES AVEC UN LASER OU UNE MACHINE-OUTIL | [2022/50] |
Former [2018/18] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM DATENAUSTAUSCH MIT EINEM LASER ODER EINER WERKZEUGMASCHINE | ||
Former [2018/18] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR EXCHANGING DATA WITH A LASER OR A MACHINE TOOL | ||
Former [2018/18] | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'ÉCHANGE DE DONNÉES AVEC UN LASER OU UNE MACHINE-OUTIL | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/18] | 09.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 03.05.2023 | DK | 03.05.2023 | EE | 03.05.2023 | ES | 03.05.2023 | FI | 03.05.2023 | HR | 03.05.2023 | IT | 03.05.2023 | LT | 03.05.2023 | LV | 03.05.2023 | MC | 03.05.2023 | NL | 03.05.2023 | PL | 03.05.2023 | RO | 03.05.2023 | RS | 03.05.2023 | SE | 03.05.2023 | SI | 03.05.2023 | SK | 03.05.2023 | SM | 03.05.2023 | IE | 24.06.2023 | LU | 24.06.2023 | BE | 30.06.2023 | CH | 30.06.2023 | FR | 03.07.2023 | GB | 03.08.2023 | NO | 03.08.2023 | GR | 04.08.2023 | IS | 03.09.2023 | PT | 04.09.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | CZ | 03.05.2023 | |
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
IT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
MC | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SI | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
IE | 24.06.2023 | ||
LU | 24.06.2023 | ||
BE | 30.06.2023 | ||
CH | 30.06.2023 | ||
FR | 03.07.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | CZ | 03.05.2023 | |
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
MC | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SI | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
IE | 24.06.2023 | ||
LU | 24.06.2023 | ||
BE | 30.06.2023 | ||
CH | 30.06.2023 | ||
FR | 03.07.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | CZ | 03.05.2023 | |
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
MC | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
IE | 24.06.2023 | ||
LU | 24.06.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/15] | CZ | 03.05.2023 | |
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
MC | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
LU | 24.06.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | CZ | 03.05.2023 | |
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
MC | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 03.05.2023 | |
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 03.05.2023 | |
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | ES | 03.05.2023 | |
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | ES | 03.05.2023 | |
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 03.05.2023 | |
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 03.05.2023 | |
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 03.05.2023 | |
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 03.05.2023 | |
PT | 04.09.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1429217 (GROB WERKE BURKHART GROB EK [DE]) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0012] , [0023] - [0026] - [0030] - [0031] - [0039] - [0040] - [0057] , [0060] - [0061] *; | [A]WO2006105567 (KEBA AG [AT], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 22 * * page 4, line 19 - page 7, line 4 * * page 12, lines 7-18 * * page 14, line 11 - page 15, line 32 * * page 18, lines 1-8 * * page 20, line 18 - page 22, line 5 * * page 27, lines 19-22 * * page 29, line 18 - page 30, line 2 * * page 36, lines 14-16 * * page 38, lines 8-32 * * page 42, lines 14-24 * * page 46, line 19 - page 54, line 17 *; | [XI]DE102006006803 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,5-9,11,13-16 * the whole document * [I] 2,4,10,12; | [A]DE102011089499 (HILTI AG [LI]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102013220865 (TRUMPF WERKZEUGMASCHINEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-16 * abstract ** paragraphs [0002] , [0006] - [0009] - [0017] - [0021] - [0026] , [0030] * | Examination | DE10255056 |