EP3328468 - SENSOR, CARTRIDGE AND DRUG DELIVERY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Brüningstraße 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2018/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHABBACH, Michael c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 02 /
NESSEL, Christian c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 03 /
AUERNHAMMER, Daniel c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 04 /
FRANKE, Beate c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 05 /
SOARES, Francisco c/o Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2018/23] | Representative(s) | Weilnau, Carsten, et al Patentanwälte Sturm Weilnau Franke Partnerschaft mbB Unter den Eichen 5 (Haus C-Süd) 65195 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/23] | Weilnau, Carsten, et al Quermann - Sturm - Weilnau Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unter den Eichen 5 65195 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 16741968.8 | 26.07.2016 | [2018/23] | WO2016EP67815 | Priority number, date | EP20150179216 | 31.07.2015 Original published format: EP 15179216 | [2018/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017021229 | Date: | 09.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3328468 | Date: | 06.06.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/24, G01F23/26, A61M5/145, A61M5/168, A61M5/20, G01F23/00 | [2018/23] | CPC: |
A61M5/24 (EP,US);
G01F23/268 (US);
A61M5/2422 (US);
A61M5/31568 (US);
A61M2005/3126 (US);
A61M2205/3317 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3368 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3389 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3584 (US);
A61M2205/3673 (US);
A61M2205/50 (US);
A61M2205/52 (EP,US);
A61M2205/583 (US);
A61M2205/70 (US);
A61M2205/8206 (US);
A61M2205/8212 (EP,US);
A61M2205/8243 (EP,US);
A61M2205/8293 (EP,US);
A61M5/1452 (EP,US);
A61M5/1684 (EP,US);
A61M5/20 (EP,US);
A61M5/2459 (US);
A61M5/3155 (US);
G01F11/029 (EP);
G01F23/00 (US);
G01F23/22 (EP);
G01F23/263 (EP);
G01N21/59 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/23] | Title | German: | SENSOR, KARTUSCHE UND ARZNEIMITTELABGABEVORRICHTUNG | [2018/23] | English: | SENSOR, CARTRIDGE AND DRUG DELIVERY DEVICE | [2018/23] | French: | CAPTEUR, CARTOUCHE ET DISPOSITIF D'ADMINISTRATION DE MÉDICAMENT | [2018/23] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/23] | 17.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6110148 (BROWN STEPHEN J [US], et al); | [I]US2002188259 (HICKLE RANDALL S [US], et al); | [X]WO2006021295 (DISETRONIC LICENSING AG [CH], et al); | [I]US2009318876 (HANSEN JON ULRICH [DK], et al); | [A]EP2182456 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al); | [A]WO2013050535 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]); | [XD]WO2014052997 (SEIBERSDORF LABOR GMBH [AT], et al); | [A]WO2014118111 (SANOFI AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) |