EP3319917 - SUBSTRATE PROVIDED WITH A STACK HAVING THERMAL PROPERTIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAINT-GOBAIN GLASS FRANCE Tour Saint-Gobain 12 place de l'Iris 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2020/24] |
Former [2018/20] | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Glass France 18 Avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LORENZZI, Jean Carlos 61 Rue de la Fontaine au Roi 75011 Paris / FR | 02 /
GEORGES, Benoît P.O. Box: 261107 Tiffany Tower - Floor 40 Jumeirah Lakes towers Plot W Dubai / AE | [2018/20] | Representative(s) | Saint-Gobain Recherche Département Propriété Industrielle 39 Quai Lucien Lefranc 93300 Aubervilliers / FR | [2018/20] | Application number, filing date | 16742359.9 | 30.06.2016 | [2018/20] | WO2016FR51653 | Priority number, date | FR20150056483 | 08.07.2015 Original published format: FR 1556483 | [2018/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017006030 | Date: | 12.01.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3319917 | Date: | 16.05.2018 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C03C17/36 | [2018/20] | CPC: |
C03C17/3639 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
C03C17/366 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
C03C17/36 (EP,CN,RU,US);
B32B17/10229 (US);
B32B7/02 (US);
C03C17/225 (KR);
C03C17/23 (KR);
C03C17/3613 (US);
C03C17/3626 (RU);
C03C17/3642 (KR,RU);
C03C17/3644 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
C03C17/3652 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C03C17/3668 (KR);
C03C17/3681 (RU,US);
C23C14/0036 (US);
C23C14/06 (KR);
C23C14/0652 (US);
C23C14/083 (US);
C23C14/086 (US);
C23C14/185 (US);
C23C14/3464 (US);
C23C14/35 (KR);
G02B5/208 (US);
G02B5/281 (US);
B32B2307/304 (US);
B32B2307/416 (US);
Y10T428/2495 (US);
Y10T428/24967 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/20] | Title | German: | SUBSTRAT MIT EINEM STAPEL MIT WÄRMEEIGENSCHAFTEN | [2018/20] | English: | SUBSTRATE PROVIDED WITH A STACK HAVING THERMAL PROPERTIES | [2018/20] | French: | SUBSTRAT MUNI D'UN EMPILEMENT A PROPRIETES THERMIQUES | [2018/20] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/20] | 03.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2019 | Observations by third parties | 30.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.06.2024 | 11.06.2024 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 19.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2011147864 (AGC GLASS EUROPE [BE], et al); | [I]FR2985724 (SAINT GOBAIN [FR]); | [I]WO2014177798 (SAINT GOBAIN [FR]) |