EP3250773 - EXPANDABLE PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.11.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.10.2019 [2019/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cordion Corporation 10366 Roselle Street San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2017/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEVENSON, Michael, M. 10366 Roselle Street San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2017/49] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2017/49] | Application number, filing date | 16743918.1 | 25.01.2016 | [2017/49] | WO2016US14772 | Priority number, date | US201562107955P | 26.01.2015 Original published format: US 201562107955 P | US201562187193P | 30.06.2015 Original published format: US 201562187193 P | [2017/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016123038 | Date: | 04.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3250773 | Date: | 06.12.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.08.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/24, B31D3/00, E04B9/00, E04C2/32, E04C2/22, E04B9/04, E04B1/343 | [2018/43] | CPC: |
E04B9/0414 (EP,US);
E04B1/343 (US);
E04B1/34384 (US)
|
Former IPC [2017/49] | E06B9/24, B31D3/00, E04B9/00, E04C2/32, E04C2/22, E04B9/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/49] | Title | German: | EXPANDIERBARE PLATTE | [2017/49] | English: | EXPANDABLE PANEL | [2017/49] | French: | PANNEAU EXTENSIBLE | [2017/49] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2017 | Search fee paid | 25.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/49] | 25.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/42] | 28.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2101836 (BENEDICT EDWARD L) [X] 1,2,4,5,10-13 * figures 1,2,3 *; | [A]US5620035 (JUDKINS REN [US]) [A] 1-15* figures 21,22 *; | [E]WO2016092207 (FLEXOMA [FR]) [E] 1,2,4-8,10-13 * figures 1,2,3,11 * | International search | [XY]US2101836 (BENEDICT EDWARD L) [X] 1-2, 16-18, 21-23, 27 * , entire document, especially Figs. 1-3, cols. 1-2 * [Y] 3-4, 24; | [A]US2786004 (ALEXANDER SCHWARTZ, et al) [A] 1-4, 16-18, 21-24, 27 * , entire document *; | [A]US5974763 (COLSON WENDELL B [US], et al) [A] 1-4, 16-18, 21-24, 27* , entire document, especially *; | [Y]US2001005964 (COLSON WENDELL B [US], et al) [Y] 24 * , entire document, especially Figs. 4-5; para. [0185] *; | [A]US2002020142 (SWISZCZ PAUL G [US], et al) [A] 1-4, 16-18, 21-24, 27 * , entire document *; | [Y]US2002084042 (KIMMET STEPHEN G [US]) [Y] 4 * , entire document, especially Fig. 1; para. [0015] *; | [Y]US2014054108 (WOLF RICHARD [DE], et al) [Y] 3 * , entire document, especially Fig. 1 * |