EP3250590 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS RELATING TO UNIVERSAL GLYCOFORMS FOR ENHANCED ANTI-SSEA4 ANTIBODY EFFICACY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/49] | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS RELATING TO UNIVERSAL GLYCOFORMS FOR ENHANCED ANTIBODY EFFICACY | ||
[2021/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2022 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.06.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.08.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.11.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Academia Sinica 128, Academia Road, Section 2 Nankang, Taipei 115 / TW | [2017/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WONG, Chi-Huey P.O. Box 8154 Rancho Santa Fe, CA 92067 / US | 02 /
WU, Chung-Yi No. 78-1 Dongshi St. Xizhi Dist. 221 New Taipei City / TW | 03 /
MA, Che c/o Academia Sinica 128 Academia Road Section 2 115 Taipei / TW | 04 /
WU, Han-Chung c/o Academia Sinica 128 Academia Road Section 2 115 Taipei / TW | [2018/12] |
Former [2017/49] | 01 /
WONG, Chi-Huey P.O. Box 8154 Rancho Santa Fe, CA 92067 / US | ||
02 /
WU, Chung-Yi No. 87-1 Dongshi St. Xizhi Dist. 221 New Taipei City / TW | |||
03 /
MA, Che c/o Academia Sinica 128 Academia Road Section 2 115 Taipei / TW | |||
04 /
WU, Han-Chung c/o Academia Sinica 128 Academia Road Section 2 115 Taipei / TW | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [2021/37] |
Former [2017/49] | Lavoix Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16744256.5 | 30.01.2016 | [2017/49] | WO2016US15858 | Priority number, date | US201562110338P | 30.01.2015 Original published format: US 201562110338 P | US201514723297 | 27.05.2015 Original published format: US201514723297 | US201514798312 | 13.07.2015 Original published format: US201514798312 | [2017/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016123593 | Date: | 04.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3250590 | Date: | 06.12.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3250590 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.08.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, C07K16/30, C12P19/14, A61P35/00 | [2021/25] | CPC: |
C07K16/32 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K16/18 (EP,CN,IL,KR);
A61P35/00 (EP,CN);
C07K16/241 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K16/2887 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K16/3084 (EP);
C07K16/44 (CN);
A61K2039/505 (EP,CN);
C07K2317/24 (EP,CN,IL);
C07K2317/41 (EP,CN,IL,KR);
C07K2317/56 (EP,CN,IL,KR);
C07K2317/565 (CN);
C07K2317/622 (EP,CN,IL,KR);
C07K2317/72 (EP,CN,IL,KR);
C07K2317/732 (EP,CN,IL,KR);
|
Former IPC [2021/23] | C07K16/18, C07K16/30, C12P19/14, A61P35/00 | ||
Former IPC [2017/49] | C07K16/00, C07K16/28, C07K16/30, C07K16/24, C07K16/10, A61K39/42 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT UNIVERSELLEN GLYKOFORMEN FÜR ERHÖHTE ANTI-SSEA4 ANTIKÖRPEREFFIZIENZ | [2021/23] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS RELATING TO UNIVERSAL GLYCOFORMS FOR ENHANCED ANTI-SSEA4 ANTIBODY EFFICACY | [2021/23] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS CONCERNANT DES GLYCOFORMES UNIVERSELLES POUR UNE EFFICACITÉ D'ANTICORPS ANTI-SSEA4 AMÉLIORÉE | [2021/23] |
Former [2017/49] | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT UNIVERSELLEN GLYKOFORMEN FÜR ERHÖHTE ANTIKÖRPEREFFIZIENZ | ||
Former [2017/49] | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS RELATING TO UNIVERSAL GLYCOFORMS FOR ENHANCED ANTIBODY EFFICACY | ||
Former [2017/49] | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS CONCERNANT DES GLYCOFORMES UNIVERSELLES POUR UNE EFFICACITÉ D'ANTICORPS AMÉLIORÉE | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2017 | Search fee paid | 29.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/49] | 29.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.05.2021 | 05.05.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.05.2021 | 05.05.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 06.05.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 07.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.08.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.01.2016 | AL | 15.09.2021 | CY | 15.09.2021 | EE | 15.09.2021 | HR | 15.09.2021 | LT | 15.09.2021 | LV | 15.09.2021 | MC | 15.09.2021 | MK | 15.09.2021 | PL | 15.09.2021 | RO | 15.09.2021 | RS | 15.09.2021 | SE | 15.09.2021 | SI | 15.09.2021 | SK | 15.09.2021 | SM | 15.09.2021 | BG | 15.12.2021 | GR | 16.12.2021 | IS | 15.01.2022 | PT | 17.01.2022 | IE | 30.01.2022 | LU | 30.01.2022 | [2024/22] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 30.01.2016 | |
AL | 15.09.2021 | ||
CY | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
IE | 30.01.2022 | ||
LU | 30.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 30.01.2016 | |
AL | 15.09.2021 | ||
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
IE | 30.01.2022 | ||
LU | 30.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
IE | 30.01.2022 | ||
LU | 30.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
LU | 30.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
MC | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SI | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 15.09.2021 | |
EE | 15.09.2021 | ||
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | EE | 15.09.2021 | |
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
SM | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | EE | 15.09.2021 | |
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RO | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
IS | 15.01.2022 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | EE | 15.09.2021 | |
HR | 15.09.2021 | ||
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
PL | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
SK | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
PT | 17.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/10] | HR | 15.09.2021 | |
LT | 15.09.2021 | ||
LV | 15.09.2021 | ||
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
GR | 16.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | LT | 15.09.2021 | |
RS | 15.09.2021 | ||
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | LT | 15.09.2021 | |
SE | 15.09.2021 | ||
BG | 15.12.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2011263828 (WONG CHI-HUEY [US], et al) [Y] 1-19* paragraphs [0020] , [0021] , [0091] , [0092]; claim 6 *; | [Y]WO2013120066 (UNIV MARYLAND [US]) [Y] 1-19 * figures 1,3a,5a,7,8 *; | [Y] - Y.-W. LOU ET AL, "Stage-specific embryonic antigen-4 as a potential therapeutic target in glioblastoma multiforme and other cancers", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (20140203), vol. 111, no. 7, doi:10.1073/pnas.1400283111, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 2482 - 2487, XP055218264 [Y] 1-19 * figures 1,5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1400283111 | [Y] - WEI HUANG ET AL, "Chemoenzymatic Glycoengineering of Intact IgG Antibodies for Gain of Functions", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (20120716), vol. 134, no. 29, doi:10.1021/ja3051266, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 12308 - 12318, XP055425387 [Y] 1-19 * Schemes 1-3;; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja3051266 | International search | [YA]US2006286637 (HAMILTON STEPHEN R [US]) [Y] 1, 2, 12, 19 * claim 1, para [0162], [0341], [0364], [0435], [0436] * [A] 31-11, 13-18; | [A]WO2008133857 (SCHERING CORP [US], et al) [A] 8-11, 13/(10, 11), (14-18)/13/(10, 11)* Claim 5; SEQ ID NO 12, 98.6% identity to SEQ ID NO:203 *; | [A]WO2011074621 (MEDICAL & BIOL LAB CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 8-11, 13/(10, 11), (14-18)/13/(10, 11) * Claim 2; SEQ ID NO 2, amino acids 20-141, 88.1% identity to SEQ ID NO:202 *; | [A]US2013196356 (JACKSON GRAHAM STUART [GB], et al) [A] 3-7, 13/(6, 7), 14-18/13/(6, 7) * SEQ ID NO 11, amino acids 23-129, 93.3% identity to SEQ ID NO:148 *; | [A]WO2014078373 (IOGENETICS LLC [US]) [A] 3-7, 13/(6, 7), 14-18/13/(6, 7) * Example 9; SEQ ID NO 276, amino acids 24-139, 91.2% identity to SEQ ID NO: 147 *; | [YA] - LOU et al., "Stage-specific embryonic antigen-4 as a potential therapeutic target in glioblastoma multiforme and other cancers", Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (20140000), vol. 111, no. 7, pages 2482 - 7, XP055218264 [Y] 1, 2, 12, 19 * ; Abstract, pg 2483, col 1 * [A] 3-11, 13-18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1400283111 | [YA] - ZOU et al., "Chemoenzymatic synthesis and Fcgamma receptor binding of homogeneous glycoforms of antibody Fc domain. Presence of a bisecting sugar moiety enhances the affinity of Fc to Fcllla receptor", J Am Chem Soc., (20110000), vol. 133, no. 46, pages 18975 - 91, XP055061687 [Y] 1, 2, 12, 19 * ; Abstract, pg 24[according to the posted document], Fig 1 and its legend * [A] 31-11, 13-18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja208390n | by applicant | US351 | US3773919 | USRE30985E | US4419446 | US4560655 | US4601978 | WO8700195 | US4657866 | US4676980 | US4767704 | US4816567 | WO9003430 | US4927762 | US4965199 | US4975278 | WO9100360 | US5004697 | WO9110741 | WO9200373 | US5112596 | WO9209690 | US5122469 | WO9301161 | WO9306213 | WO9308829 | WO9316185 | US5264365 | US5268164 | WO9404690 | WO9411026 | WO9607754 | US5500362 | US5506206 | US5508192 | US5545807 | US5545806 | US5565332 | US5569825 | WO9634096 | WO9633735 | US5571894 | US5580717 | US5587458 | US5625126 | US5633425 | US5639635 | US5641870 | US5648237 | US5661016 | US5686416 | US5733743 | WO9824893 | US5821337 | US5840523 | US5869046 | US6004940 | US6027888 | US6083715 | US6265150 | US6329173 | US2002025313 | US2002038086 | US2002065259 | US2003073713 | US2003083299 | US2003104402 | US2003129186 | US2003162695 | WO03077945 | EP1391213 | US6703019 | US2004131692 | US2004204354 | US2005089473 | US2005124533 | US2009317837 | US2010136042 | US2014051127 | WO2015184009 | - LOU Y.-W. et al., PNAS, (20140000), vol. 111, no. 7, pages 2482 - 2487 | - CHEN, Y. et al., J. Mol Biol, (19990000), vol. 293, pages 865 - 881 | - ARIE et al., Mol. Microbiol., (20010000), vol. 39, pages 199 - 210 | - ORLANDIWARD et al., Nature, (19890000), vol. 341, pages 544 - 546 | - CHOTHIA et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19870000), vol. 196, pages 901 - 917 | - GALFRE et al., Methods Enzymol., (19810000), vol. 73, pages 563 - 681 | - WILEN et al., Tetrahedron, (19770000), vol. 33, page 2725 | - WILEN, Tables of Resolving Agents and Optical Resolutions, Univ. of Notre Dame Press, (19720000), page 268 | - RIECHMANN et al., Nature, (19880000), vol. 332, pages 323 - 327 | - MORRISON et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19840000), vol. 81, pages 6851 - 6855 | - JONES et al., Nature, (19860000), vol. 321, pages 522 - 525 | - PRESTA et al., Cancer Res., (19970000), vol. 57, pages 4593 - 4599 | - CLACKSON et al., Nature, (19910000), vol. 352, pages 624 - 628 | - KOHLER et al., Nature, (19750000), vol. 256, page 495 | - TOMLINSON et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19920000), vol. 227, pages 776 - 798 | - SIDHU et al., J. Mol. Biol., (20040000), vol. 340, no. 5, pages 1073 - 1093 | - FELLOUSE, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (20040000), vol. 101, no. 34, pages 12467 - 12472 | - LEE et al., J. Immunol. Methods, (20040000), vol. 284, no. 1-2, pages 119 - 132 | - JAKOBOVITS et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19930000), vol. 90, pages 7889 - 7893 | - JAKOBOVITS et al., Nature, (19930000), vol. 362, pages 255 - 258 | - BRUGGERMANN et al., Year in Immunol., (19930000), vol. 7, page 33 | - MARKS et al., Bio. Technology, (19920000), vol. 10, pages 779 - 783 | - LONBERG et al., Nature, (19940000), vol. 368, pages 812 - 813 | - FISHWILD et al., Nature Biotechnol., (19960000), vol. 14, pages 826 - 851 | - LONBERGHUSZAR, Intern. Rev. Immunol., (19950000), vol. 13, pages 65 - 93 | - PRESTA, Curr. Op. Struct. Biol., (19920000), vol. 2, pages 593 - 596 | - VASWANIHAMILTON, Ann. Allergy, Asthma & Immunol., (19980000), vol. 1, pages 105 - 115 | - HARRIS, Biochem. Soc. Transactions, (19950000), vol. 23, pages 1035 - 1038 | - HURLEGROSS, Curr. Op. Biotech., (19940000), vol. 5, pages 428 - 433 | - HOOGENBOOM et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19910000), vol. 227, pages 381 - 597 | - BARBAS et al., Proc Nat. Acad. Sci. USA, (19940000), vol. 113, pages 3809 - 3813 | - CARTER et al., Bio/Technology, (19920000), vol. 10, pages 163 - 167 | - SCHIER et al., Gene, (19950000), vol. 169, pages 147 - 155 | - JACKSON et al., J. Immunol., (19950000), vol. 154, no. 7, pages 3310 - 2004 | - WINTER et al., Ann. Rev. Immunol., (19940000), vol. 12, pages 433 - 455 | - VERHOEYEN et al., Science, (19880000), vol. 239, pages 1534 - 1536 | - GRIFFITHS et al., EMBO J, (19930000), vol. 12, pages 725 - 734 | - HOOGENBOOM et al., Nucl. Acids Res., (19910000), vol. 19, pages 4133 - 4137 | - ORLANDI et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. (USA, (19890000), vol. 86, pages 5728 - 5732 | - JONES et al., Biotechnol., (19910000), vol. 9, pages 88 - 89 | - ORUM et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (19930000), vol. 21, pages 4491 - 4498 | - MATSUDA et al., Nature Genet., (19930000), vol. 3, pages 88 - 94 | - CARTER et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19920000), vol. 89, pages 4285 - 3580 | - WILLIAMSWINTER, Eur. J. Immunol., (19930000), vol. 23, pages 1456 - 1461 | - HOGREFE et al., Gene, (19930000), vol. 128, pages 119 - 126 | - WATERHOUSE et al., Nucl. Acids Res., (19930000), vol. 21, pages 2265 - 2266 | - BARBAS et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19910000), vol. 88, pages 7978 - 7982 | - EMBLETON et al., Nucl. Acids Res., (19920000), vol. 20, pages 3831 - 3837 | - BASS et al., Proteins, (19900000), vol. 8, pages 309 - 314 | - MARKS et al., Biotechnol., (19920000), vol. 10, pages 779 - 783 | - SKERRA et al., Curr. Opinion in Immunol., (19930000), vol. 5, pages 256 - 262 | - PLUCKTHUN, Immunol. Revs, (19920000), vol. 130, page 151 | - LEUNG et al., Technique, (19890000), vol. 1, pages 11 - 15 | - GUSS et al., EMBO J., (19860000), vol. 5, pages 15671575 - 103 | - KOZBOR, J. Immunol., (19840000), vol. 133, page 3001 | - BRODEUR et al., Monoclonal Antibody Production Techniques and Applications, American Society for Microbiology, (19870000), vol. 2, pages 1190 - 1219 | - BARNES et al., Anal. Biochem., (19800000), vol. 102, page 255 | - ENGELS et al., Agnew. Chem. Int. Ed. Engl., (19890000), vol. 28, pages 716 - 734 | - ABRAHMSEN et al., EMBO J., (19850000), vol. 4, page 3901 | - Methods in Enzymology, (19760000), vol. 44 | - RAVETCHKINET, Annu. Rev. Immunol, (19910000), vol. 1-3, pages 457 - 3242 | - SIEBENLIST et al., Cell, (19800000), vol. 20, page 269 | - YANSURA et al., METHODS: A Companion to Methods in Enzymol., (19920000), vol. 4, pages 151 - 158 | - SIMMONS et al., J. Immunol. Methods, (20020000), vol. 263, pages 133 - 147 | - CHEN et al., J Bio Chem, (19990000), vol. 274, pages 19601 - 19605 | - BOTHMANNPLUCKTHUN, J. Biol. Chem., (20000000), vol. 275, pages 17106 - 17113 | - HARA et al., Microbial Drug Resistance, (19960000), vol. 2, pages 63 - 72 | - LINDMARK et al., J. Immunol. Meth., (19830000), vol. 62, pages 1 - 13 | - REYES et al., Nature, (19820000), vol. 297, pages 598 - 601 | - GRAHAM et al., J. Gen Virol., (19770000), vol. 36, page 59 | - URLAUB et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19800000), vol. 77, page 4216 | - MATHER, Biol. Reprod., (19800000), vol. 23, pages 243 - 251 | - MATHER et al., Annals N.Y. Acad. Sci., (19820000), vol. 383, pages 44 - 68 | - HAM et al., Meth. Enz., (19790000), vol. 58, page 44 | - CLYNES et al., PNAS (USA, (19980000), vol. 95, pages 652 - 656 | - GAZZANO-SANTORO et al., J. Immunol. Methods, (19960000), vol. 202, page 163 | - MORIMOTO et al., Journal of Biochemical and Biophysical Methods, (19920000), vol. 24, pages 107 - 117 | - BRENNAN et al., Science, (19850000), vol. 229, page 81 | - MCCAFFERTY et al., Nature, (19900000), vol. 348, pages 552 - 554 | - PLUCKTHUN, Immunol. Rev., (19920000), vol. 130, pages 151 - 188 | - MORRISON et al., Proc. Nat. Acad. Sci., (19840000), vol. 81, page 6851 | - NEUBERGER et al., Nature, (19840000), vol. 314, page 452 | - PRESTA et al., J. Immunol., (19930000), vol. 151, page 2623 | - CARTER et al., Proc. Natl. Acad Sci. USA, (19920000), vol. 89, page 4285 | - PRESTAETAL., J. Immnol., (19930000), vol. 151, page 2623 | - BRUGGERMANN et al., Year in Immuno., (19930000), vol. 7, page 33 | - WINTER, Annu. Rev. Immunol., (19940000), vol. 12, pages 433 - 455 | - MARKS et al., J. Mol Biol., (19910000), vol. 222, pages 581 - 597 | - WATERHOUSE et al., Nuc. Acids. Res., (19930000), vol. 21, pages 2265 - 2266 | - LIU et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19960000), vol. 93, pages 8618 - 8623 | - SYRIGOSEPENETOS, Anticancer Research, (19990000), vol. 19, pages 605 - 614 | - JONES et al., Biotechnol, (19910000), vol. 9, pages 88 - 89 | - MARKS et al., Biotechnol, (19920000), vol. 10, pages 779 - 783 | - YANSURA et al., METHODS: A Companion to Methods in Enzymol, (19920000), vol. 4, pages 151 - 158 | - GRAHAM et al., J. Gen Virol, (19770000), vol. 36, page 59 | - BOERNER et al., J. Immunol., (19910000), vol. 147, page 60 | - MILSTEINCUELLO, Nature, (19830000), vol. 305, page 537 | - TRAUNECKER et al., EMBO J., (19910000), vol. 10, page 3655 | - SURESH et al., Methods in Enzymology, (19860000), vol. 121, page 210 | - SHALABY et al., J. Exp. Med., (19920000), vol. 175, pages 217 - 225 | - KOSTELNY et al., J. Immunol., (19920000), vol. 148, no. 5, pages 1547 - 1553 | - GRUBER et al., J. Immunol., (19940000), vol. 152, page 5368 | - CUNNINGHAMWELLS, Science, (19890000), vol. 244, pages 1081 - 1085 | - A. L. LEHNINGER, Biochemistry, Worth Publishers, (19750000), pages 73 - 75 | - NICULESCU-DUVAZSPRINGER, Adv. Drg Del. Rev., (19970000), vol. 26, pages 151 - 172 | - BALDWIN et al., Lancet, (19860315), pages 603 - 05 | - THORPE et al., "Antibody Carriers Of Cytotoxic Agents In Cancer Therapy: A Review", Monoclonal Antibodies '84: Biological And Clinical Applications, (19850000), pages 475 - 506 | - ROWLAND et al., Cancer Immunol. Immunother., (19860000), vol. 21, pages 183 - 87 | - MANDLER et al., Jour. of the Nat. Cancer Inst., (20000000), vol. 92, no. 19, pages 1573 - 1581 | - MANDLER et al., Bioorganic & Med. Chem. Letters, (20000000), vol. 10, pages 1025 - 1028 | - MANDLER et al., Bioconjugate Chem., (20020000), vol. 13, pages 786 - 791 | - LODE et al., Cancer Res., (19980000), vol. 58, page 2928 | - HINMAN et al., Cancer Res., (19930000), vol. 53, pages 3336 - 3342 | - KAM et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., (20050000), vol. 102, pages 11600 - 11605 | - MARASCO, Gene Therapy, (19970000), vol. 4, pages 11 - 15 | - KONTERMANN, Methods, (20040000), vol. 34, pages 163 - 170 | - CHEN et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19990000), vol. 96, pages 4325 - 4329 | - PAPANASTASSIOU et al., Gene Therapy, (20020000), vol. 9, pages 398 - 406 | - BOBO et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19940000), vol. 91, pages 2076 - 2080 | - GILL et al., Nature Med., (20030000), vol. 9, pages 589 - 595 | - Peptide and Protein Drug Delivery, pages 247 - 301 | - A. Adv. Drug Delivery Rev, Marcel Dekker, Inc., (19910000), vol. 10, pages 29 - 90 | - LOBUGLIO, A.F.WHEELER, R.H.TRANG, J.HAYNES, A.ROGERS, K.HARVEY, E.B.SUN, L.GHRAYEB, J.KHAZAELI, M.B., "Mouse/human chimeric monoclonal antibody in man: kinetics and immune response", Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (19890000), vol. 86, doi:10.1073/pnas.86.11.4220, pages 4220 - 4224, XP002100301 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.86.11.4220 | - ROGUSKA, M.A.PEDERSEN, J.T.KEDDY, C.A.HENRY, A.H.SEARLE, S.J.LAMBERT, J.M.GOLDMACHER, V.S.BLATTLER, W.A.REES, A.R.GUILD, B.C., "Humanization of murine monoclonal antibodies through variable domain resurfacing", Proc Natl Acad Sci U S A, (19940000), vol. 91, doi:10.1073/pnas.91.3.969, pages 969 - 973, XP002271704 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.91.3.969 | - LU, R.-M.CHANG, Y.-L.CHEN, M.-S.WU, H.-C., "Single chain anti-c-Met antibody conjugated nanoparticles for in vivo tumor-targeted imaging and drug delivery", Biomaterials, (20110000), vol. 32, pages 3265 - 3274 |