Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10513880 | Global Dossier | 24.12.2019 | B2 | US2018245400 | 30.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP67768 | 26.07.2016 | EP15183129 | 31.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20180044917 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP67768 | 26.07.2016 | EP15183129 | 31.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2018525551 | Global Dossier | 06.09.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP67768 | 26.07.2016 | EP15183129 | 31.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107923223B | Global Dossier | 23.07.2021 | B | CN107923223 | 17.04.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP67768 | 26.07.2016 | EP15183129 | 31.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2016314586B | Global Dossier | 22.08.2019 | B2 | AU2016314586 | 15.02.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP67768 | 26.07.2016 | EP15183129 | 31.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3344843 | Global Dossier | 22.04.2020 | B1 | EP3344843 | 11.07.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP67768 | 26.07.2016 | EP15183129 | 31.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11201800820V | 28.03.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP67768 | 26.07.2016 | EP15183129 | 31.08.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017036679 | Global Dossier | 09.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15183129 | 31.08.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3135851 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15183129 | 31.08.2015 |