Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10542792 | Global Dossier | 28.01.2020 | B2 | US2017340063 | 30.11.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715676942 | 14.08.2017 | US201514817501 | 04.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3677139 | Global Dossier | 10.11.2021 | B1 | EP3677139 | 08.07.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016US42752 | 18.07.2016 | EP16745007 | 18.07.2016 | US201514817501 | 04.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107920628B | Global Dossier | 05.02.2021 | B | CN107920628 | 17.04.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016US42752 | 18.07.2016 | US201514817501 | 04.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3331394 | Global Dossier | 09.10.2019 | B1 | EP3331394 | 13.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016US42752 | 18.07.2016 | US201514817501 | 04.08.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017023524 | Global Dossier | 09.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514817501 | 04.08.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9730490 | Global Dossier | 15.08.2017 | B2 | US2017035147 | 09.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514817501 | 04.08.2015 | Type | Divisional application | EP3677139 |