EP3331394 - UPPER FOR AN ARTICLE OF FOOTWEAR WITH AUXETIC CONFIGURATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nike Innovate C.V. Dutch Partnership One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US | [2018/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FARRIS, Bryan N. c/o Nike, Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US | 02 /
GHEORGHIAN, Petre c/o Nike, Inc. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US | [2018/24] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2018/24] | Application number, filing date | 16745007.1 | 18.07.2016 | [2018/24] | WO2016US42752 | Priority number, date | US201514817501 | 04.08.2015 Original published format: US201514817501 | [2018/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017023524 | Date: | 09.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3331394 | Date: | 13.06.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3331394 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A43B23/02 | [2018/24] | CPC: |
A43B23/0205 (EP,US);
A43B23/027 (US);
A43B23/0245 (EP,US);
A43B23/026 (US);
A43B23/0265 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHUHOBERTEIL FÜR SCHUHWERK MIT AUXETISCHER KONFIGURATION | [2018/24] | English: | UPPER FOR AN ARTICLE OF FOOTWEAR WITH AUXETIC CONFIGURATION | [2018/24] | French: | EMPEIGNE POUR ARTICLE CHAUSSANT, À CONFIGURATION AUXÉTIQUE | [2018/24] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/24] | 23.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19201738.2 / EP3677139 | Opposition(s) | 10.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.07.2016 | AL | 09.10.2019 | AT | 09.10.2019 | CY | 09.10.2019 | CZ | 09.10.2019 | DK | 09.10.2019 | EE | 09.10.2019 | ES | 09.10.2019 | FI | 09.10.2019 | HR | 09.10.2019 | IT | 09.10.2019 | LT | 09.10.2019 | LV | 09.10.2019 | MC | 09.10.2019 | MK | 09.10.2019 | MT | 09.10.2019 | NL | 09.10.2019 | PL | 09.10.2019 | RO | 09.10.2019 | RS | 09.10.2019 | SE | 09.10.2019 | SI | 09.10.2019 | SK | 09.10.2019 | SM | 09.10.2019 | TR | 09.10.2019 | BG | 09.01.2020 | NO | 09.01.2020 | GR | 10.01.2020 | IS | 09.02.2020 | PT | 10.02.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 18.07.2016 | |
AL | 09.10.2019 | ||
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CY | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
MT | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
TR | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
AT | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 09.10.2019 | |
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 09.10.2019 | |
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 09.10.2019 | |
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 09.10.2019 | |
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NL | 09.10.2019 | |
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | NL | 09.10.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2008011021 (STARBUCK MICHAEL [GB], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2010125397 (GLOBAL COMPOSITES GROUP [GB], et al) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [A]US2014101816 (TORONJO ALAN [US]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2015019451 (ASICS CORP [JP]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * |