EP3325416 - METHOD FOR PROVIDING A CO- AND NI-FREE VITREOUS ENAMELLED METAL COATED STEEL SUBSTRATE AND A PRIMER COMPOSITION THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2020 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Onderzoekscentrum voor Aanwending van Staal N.V. Pres. J.F. Kennedylaan 3 9060 Zelzate / BE | [2018/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE STRYCKER, Joost Remi Margueritte c/o 3 Pres. J.F. Kennedylaan 9060 Zelzate / BE | 02 /
LEVEAUX, Marc Henri André c/o 3 Pres. J.F. Kennedylaan 9060 Zelzate / BE | 03 /
KNOCKAERT, Pierre Claude Victor c/o 3 J.F. Kennedylaan 9060 Zelzate / BE | [2018/22] | Representative(s) | EP&C P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [2018/22] | Application number, filing date | 16745077.4 | 20.07.2016 | [2018/22] | WO2016EP67293 | Priority number, date | NL20152015222 | 24.07.2015 Original published format: NL 2015222 | [2018/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017016952 | Date: | 02.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3325416 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3325416 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C03C3/064, C03C1/04, C23D3/00, C23D5/00, C03C3/066, C03C8/08, C03C17/04 | [2019/04] | CPC: |
C03C8/08 (EP,EA,KR,US);
C03C3/064 (EP,EA,US);
C03C17/04 (EP,EA,US);
C03C3/066 (EP,EA,KR,US);
C03C2207/02 (EP,EA,KR,US);
C03C2207/04 (EP,EA,KR,US);
C03C2207/08 (EP,EA,KR,US);
C23D3/00 (EP,EA,US);
C23D5/00 (EP,EA,US);
C23D5/02 (EA,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/22] | C03C3/066, C03C8/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINES CO- UND NI-FREIEN GLASIERTEN METALLBESCHICHTETEN STAHLSUBSTRATS UND GRUNDIERUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG DAFÜR | [2018/22] | English: | METHOD FOR PROVIDING A CO- AND NI-FREE VITREOUS ENAMELLED METAL COATED STEEL SUBSTRATE AND A PRIMER COMPOSITION THEREFOR | [2018/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN SUBSTRAT EN ACIER REVÊTU DE MÉTAL ÉMAILLÉ DÉPOURVU DE CO ET DE NI ET COMPOSITION DE PRIMAIRE À CET EFFET | [2018/22] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/22] | 23.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 09.10.2019 | CY | 09.10.2019 | EE | 09.10.2019 | FI | 09.10.2019 | HR | 09.10.2019 | LT | 09.10.2019 | LV | 09.10.2019 | MC | 09.10.2019 | MK | 09.10.2019 | MT | 09.10.2019 | RS | 09.10.2019 | SM | 09.10.2019 | NO | 09.01.2020 | GR | 10.01.2020 | IS | 09.02.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
CY | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
MT | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | FI | 09.10.2019 | |
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 09.10.2019 | |
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 09.10.2019 | |
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 09.01.2020 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH10139476 ; | [A]RU2013403 (INST GEOFIZIKI I GEOL AN RESPU [MD]) [A] 1-25 * examples 1-4; tables 1,2 *; | [A]WO9828236 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-25 * page 5; example 1 *; | [A]EP1190994 (FERRO FRANCE SARL [FR]) [A] 1-25* paragraphs [0001] - [0006]; example 1 *; | [A]RU2207992 (KIROV ZD AOOT) [A] 1-25 * examples 1-3; table 1 *; | [A]EP2662339 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-25 * table 1 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 31, Database accession no. 1998-357253, XP002758261 & JPH10139476 A 19980526 (NIPPON FERRO KK) [X] 1-25 * examples 2,4; tables 1,2 * |