EP3325492 - DEHYDROGENATIVE SILYLATION, HYDROSILYLATION AND CROSSLINKING USING PYRIDINEDIIMINE COBALT CARBOXYLATE CATALYSTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Momentive Performance Materials Inc. 260 Hudson River Road Waterford, NY 12188 / US | For all designated states Princeton University 4 New South Building Princeton, NJ 08544 / US | [2019/16] |
Former [2018/22] | For all designated states Momentive Performance Materials Inc. 260 Hudson River Road Waterford, NY 12188 / US | ||
For all designated states The Trustees of Princeton University 4 New South Building P.O.Box 36 Princeton, New Jersey 08544 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHIRIK, Paul 3 Crestview Drive Princeton, New Jersey 08540 / US | 02 /
SCHUSTER, Christopher 2004 Quail Ridge Drive Plainsboro, New Jersey 08536 / US | 03 /
BOYER, Julie 6667 Downdale Pl. Columbia, Maryland 21045 / US | 04 /
ROY, Aroop K. 20 Gladstone Circle Mechanicville, New York 12118 / US | 05 /
LEWIS, Kenrick 43-28 193rd Street Flushing, New York 11358 / US | 06 /
DELIS, Johannes G. P. Wissendijke 3 4617NJ Bergen op Zoom / NL | [2018/25] |
Former [2018/22] | 01 /
CHIRIK, Paul 3 Crestview Drive Princeton, New Jersey 08540 / US | ||
02 /
SCHUSTER, Christopher 2004 Quail Ridge Drive Plainsboro, New Jersey 08536 / US | |||
03 /
BOYER, Julie 107 Beryl Way Watervliet, New York 12189 / US | |||
04 /
ROY, Aroop K. 20 Gladstone Circle Mechanicville, New York 12118 / US | |||
05 /
LEWIS, Kenrick 43-28 193rd Street Flushing, New York 11358 / US | |||
06 /
DELIS, Johannes G. P. Wissendijke 3 4617NJ Bergen op Zoom / NL | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/22] | Gille Hrabal Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 16745367.9 | 22.07.2016 | [2018/22] | WO2016US43464 | Priority number, date | US201562196408P | 24.07.2015 Original published format: US 201562196408 P | [2018/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017019473 | Date: | 02.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3325492 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3325492 | Date: | 18.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07F15/06, C07F7/18, B01J31/18 | [2018/22] | CPC: |
C07F7/1876 (EP,US);
B01J31/1815 (EP,US);
B01J31/2239 (EP,US);
C07F15/065 (EP,US);
C08G77/08 (US);
B01J2231/323 (EP,US);
B01J2531/845 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DEHYDRIERENDE SILYLIERUNG, HYDROSILYLIERUNG UND VERNETZUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG VON PYRIDINDIIMIN-KOBALT-CARBOXYLAT-KATALYSATOREN | [2018/22] | English: | DEHYDROGENATIVE SILYLATION, HYDROSILYLATION AND CROSSLINKING USING PYRIDINEDIIMINE COBALT CARBOXYLATE CATALYSTS | [2018/22] | French: | SILYLATION DÉSHYDROGÉNANTE, HYDROSILYLATION ET RÉTICULATION À L'AIDE DE CATALYSEURS À BASE DE PYRIDINEDIIMINE-CARBOXYLATE DE COBALT | [2018/22] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/22] | 01.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.07.2016 | AL | 18.09.2019 | AT | 18.09.2019 | CY | 18.09.2019 | CZ | 18.09.2019 | DK | 18.09.2019 | EE | 18.09.2019 | ES | 18.09.2019 | FI | 18.09.2019 | HR | 18.09.2019 | LT | 18.09.2019 | LV | 18.09.2019 | MC | 18.09.2019 | MK | 18.09.2019 | MT | 18.09.2019 | NL | 18.09.2019 | PL | 18.09.2019 | RO | 18.09.2019 | RS | 18.09.2019 | SE | 18.09.2019 | SI | 18.09.2019 | SK | 18.09.2019 | SM | 18.09.2019 | TR | 18.09.2019 | BG | 18.12.2019 | NO | 18.12.2019 | GR | 19.12.2019 | IS | 19.01.2020 | PT | 20.01.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 22.07.2016 | |
AL | 18.09.2019 | ||
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CY | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
MT | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
TR | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
ES | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
NL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
SE | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 18.09.2019 | |
NO | 18.12.2019 | Cited in | International search | [I]US2014051822 (ATIENZA CRISITA CARMEN HOJILLA [US], et al) [I] 1-43* pages 9,17; examples 2,17 * |