|
07.07.2020 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2019 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2019 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.06.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.06.2019 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.06.2019 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.06.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.04.2019 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2019 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.04.2019 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.02.2019 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.02.2019 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2019 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
14.02.2019 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
06.02.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.2019 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2018 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.07.2018 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2018 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2018 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.05.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2018 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2018 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2018 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2018 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.01.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2018 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.01.2018 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.12.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.12.2017 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
20.12.2017 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.11.2017 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.01.2017 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
29.12.2016 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.12.2016 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.12.2016 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
18.11.2016 |
Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
03.11.2016 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
03.11.2016 |
ISR: cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
03.11.2016 |
International Search Report - copy in English for the IB |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
02.11.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
02.11.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
02.11.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
25.08.2016 |
Incoming letter related to ISA procedure |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
25.08.2016 |
Notification Concerning Documents Transmitted (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
25.08.2016 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
16.08.2016 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
04.08.2016 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
24.06.2016 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
24.06.2016 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
24.06.2016 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
9 |
|
24.06.2016 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
5 |