EP3314534 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SEARCHING IMAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2022 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.04.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Politecnico di Torino Corso Duca degli Abruzzi 24 10129 Torino / IT | [2018/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VALSESIA, Diego Viale Bogogno 8 28021 Borgomanero (NO) / IT | 02 /
COLUCCIA, Giulio Via Leonardo da Vinci 9/1 10095 Grugliasco (TO) / IT | 03 /
BIANCHI, Tiziano Viale Alcide de Gasperi 63 59100 Prato / IT | 04 /
MAGLI, Enrico Via Ferranrte Aporti 28 10131 Torino / IT | [2018/18] | Representative(s) | Ferroni, Filippo, et al Metroconsult Genova S.r.l. Via Palestro, 5/2 16122 Genova / IT | [2021/35] |
Former [2018/18] | Ferroni, Filippo, et al Metroconsult Genova S.r.l. Via Palestro, 5 16122 Genova / IT | Application number, filing date | 16745824.9 | 20.06.2016 | [2018/18] | WO2016IB53656 | Priority number, date | IT2015UB01608 | 23.06.2015 Original published format: IT UB20151608 | [2018/18] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016207774 | Date: | 29.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3314534 | Date: | 02.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3314534 | Date: | 01.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/46, G06K9/62, G06F16/583, G06F16/51, G06K9/00 | [2021/14] | CPC: |
G06F16/5838 (EP,US);
G06F18/22 (IL,US);
G06F16/51 (EP,US);
G06F16/583 (EP,CN,US);
G06F18/2137 (CN,IL,US);
G06F18/21375 (IL);
G06V10/7515 (EP,CN,US);
G06V10/7715 (EP,US);
G06V20/80 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/18] | G06K9/46, G06F17/30, G06K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SUCHEN VON BILDERN | [2018/18] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SEARCHING IMAGES | [2018/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE RECHERCHE D'IMAGES | [2018/18] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/18] | 10.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.03.2021 | 04.03.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 07.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.06.2016 | AL | 01.09.2021 | AT | 01.09.2021 | CY | 01.09.2021 | CZ | 01.09.2021 | DK | 01.09.2021 | EE | 01.09.2021 | FI | 01.09.2021 | HR | 01.09.2021 | IT | 01.09.2021 | LT | 01.09.2021 | LV | 01.09.2021 | MC | 01.09.2021 | MK | 01.09.2021 | RO | 01.09.2021 | RS | 01.09.2021 | SI | 01.09.2021 | SK | 01.09.2021 | SM | 01.09.2021 | TR | 01.09.2021 | BG | 01.12.2021 | NO | 01.12.2021 | GR | 02.12.2021 | IS | 01.01.2022 | PT | 03.01.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 20.06.2016 | |
AL | 01.09.2021 | ||
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CY | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
IT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
MK | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 20.06.2016 | |
AL | 01.09.2021 | ||
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CY | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
IT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 20.06.2016 | |
AL | 01.09.2021 | ||
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
IT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
IT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
IT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 01.09.2021 | |
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 01.09.2021 | |
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 01.09.2021 | |
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | FI | 01.09.2021 | |
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | FI | 01.09.2021 | |
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | FI | 01.09.2021 | |
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 01.09.2021 | |
NO | 01.12.2021 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2009257671 (FRIDRICH JESSICA [US], et al) [A] 1-35 * paragraphs [0018] - [0020] - [0037] - [0041] *; | [A]GB2486987 (FORENSIC PATHWAYS LTD [GB]) [A] 1-35 * page 9, line 1 - page 19, line 31 *; | [A]US2012195476 (BAYRAM SEVINE [US], et al) [A] 15,16,34,35* paragraphs [0037] - [0041] - [0054] - [0068] *; | [XI] - DIEGO VALSESIA ET AL, "Compressed Fingerprint Matching and Camera Identification via Random Projections", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INFORMATION FORENSICS AND SECURITY, US, (20150602), vol. 10, no. 7, doi:10.1109/TIFS.2015.2415461, ISSN 1556-6013, pages 1472 - 1485, XP055253084 [X] 1-9,17-27,33 * p. 1474, Section II.B, last paragraph; p. 1475, Section III.A, p. 1476, Sections III.C and III.D and p. 1483-84, section VI * [I] 10-16,28-32,34,35 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TIFS.2015.2415461 | [L] - Anonymous, "IEEE Xplore Abstract - Compressed Fingerprint Matching and Camera Identification via Random Projections", (20160225), URL: http://ieeexplore.ieee.org/xpls/abs_all.jsp?arnumber=7065259&tag=1, (20160225), XP055253097 [L] * "date of publication" * | [XI] - DIEGO VALSESIA ET AL, "Scale-robust compressive camera fingerprint matching with random projections", 2015 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (ICASSP), (20150424), doi:10.1109/ICASSP.2015.7178260, ISBN 978-1-4673-6997-8, pages 1697 - 1701, XP055253092 [X] 1-9,17-27,33 * Sections 2 and 3.4 * [I] 10-16,28-32,34,35 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.2015.7178260 |