EP3344828 - UNSEEN ATTACHMENT INSERT FOR ATTACHING A FACING TO A STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.05.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merillon, Tony 54 passage du Mont Blanc 74220 La Clusaz / FR | [2018/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2018/28] | Application number, filing date | 16745841.3 | 07.07.2016 | [2018/28] | WO2016IB54081 | Priority number, date | FR20150056416 | 07.07.2015 Original published format: FR 1556416 | [2018/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017006277 | Date: | 12.01.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3344828 | Date: | 11.07.2018 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | E04F13/08, E04F13/14, E04B1/41, F16B5/02 | [2018/28] | CPC: |
E04F13/14 (EP);
E04F13/0853 (EP);
F16B37/048 (EP);
F16B5/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/28] | Title | German: | NICHT SICHTBARER BEFESTIGUNGSEINSATZ ZUR BEFESTIGUNG EINER VERKLEIDUNG AN EINER STRUKTUR | [2018/28] | English: | UNSEEN ATTACHMENT INSERT FOR ATTACHING A FACING TO A STRUCTURE | [2018/28] | French: | INSERT DE FIXATION INVISIBLE POUR FIXATION D'UN PAREMENT À UN OUVRAGE | [2018/28] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/28] | 15.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/28] | 03.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/24] | 03.01.2019 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 29.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2019/24] | 29.01.2019 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 15.05.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 15.05.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.06.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 15.05.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 15.05.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.06.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2824877 (HILTI FRANCE [FR]) [X] 1,8,10-15 * page 5, lines 6-9,15-17; figures 1,5,6 * | [X]DE1961489 (ZAHEL DIPL ING GUENTHER) [X] 1,8,10-12 * figures 1-3,6 * | [X]US1405372 (WARREN WHITE WALTER) [X] 1,13 * page 1, lines 10-13,54-58; figures 1-3 * | [A]DE20103323U (JUNG WILLI [DE]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document * | FR2824877 [ ] |