26.02.2021 |
Refusal of application |
published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] |
09.11.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
02.11.2020 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
09.06.2020 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
01.05.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
21.02.2020 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.01.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.10.2019 |
First examination report |
|
11.10.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.02.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.02.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
17.07.2018 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
13.07.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
13.07.2018 |
Change - classification |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
06.04.2018 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 09.05.2018 [2018/19] |
06.04.2018 |
Change - extension states |
published on 09.05.2018 [2018/19] |
14.02.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.11.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 13.12.2017 [2017/50] |
10.11.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
10.11.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 13.12.2017 [2017/50] |
13.10.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.07.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.07.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.07.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.06.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
28.06.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
28.06.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.08.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.08.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|