EP3254178 - MULTI-TOUCH USER INTERFACE FOR AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.02.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tangiamo Touch Technology AB Sörhallstorget 10 417 63 Göteborg / SE | [2017/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EITERJORD, Jimmy Bronsgjutaregatan 6 SE-421 63 Västra Frölunda / SE | 02 /
NORDAHL, Mats Lingonbackarna 57 SE-142 64 Trångsund / SE | [2017/50] | Representative(s) | Kransell & Wennborg KB P.O. Box 27834 115 93 Stockholm / SE | [2017/50] | Application number, filing date | 16746906.3 | 02.02.2016 | [2017/50] | WO2016SE50077 | Priority number, date | EP20150153523 | 02.02.2015 Original published format: EP 15153523 | [2017/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016126192 | Date: | 11.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3254178 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 11.08.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/041, G06F3/03, G06F3/044 | [2018/33] | CPC: |
G06F3/04166 (EP,US);
G06F3/041 (US);
G06F3/0446 (EP,US);
G06F2203/04104 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/50] | G06F3/041, G06F3/03 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/50] | Title | German: | MEHRFACHBERÜHRUNGSBENUTZERSCHNITTSTELLE FÜR EINE ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2017/50] | English: | MULTI-TOUCH USER INTERFACE FOR AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2017/50] | French: | INTERFACE UTILISATEUR TACTILE MULTIPOINT POUR UN DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2017/50] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2017 | Search fee paid | 27.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/50] | 27.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.11.2020 | 03.11.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 10.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/13] | 20.11.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012218218 (KAUKO JARMO [FI]) [A] 10* paragraph [0049] * | International search | [X]US2002185981 (DIETZ PAUL H [US], et al); | [X]EP2518603 (WACOM CO LTD [JP]); | [X]WO2014090955 (JAGUAR LAND ROVER LTD [GB]); | [X]WO2014145924 (TACTUAL LABS CO [US]); | [X]WO2014145872 (TACTUAL LABS CO [US]); |