EP3254205 - VECTOR PROCESSOR CONFIGURED TO OPERATE ON VARIABLE LENGTH VECTORS USING INSTRUCTIONS TO COMBINE AND SPLIT VECTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Optimum Semiconductor Technologies, Inc. 120 White Plains Road 4th Floor Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | [2017/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOUDGILL, Mayan 25 Random Farms Drive Chappaqua, NY 10514 / US | 02 /
NACER, Gary, J. 1 Totten Way Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | 03 /
GLOSSNER, C., John 6 Bicentennial Drive Nashua, NH 03062 / US | 04 /
HOANE, Arthur, Joseph 10 Oakland Avenue Yonkers, NY 10710 / US | 05 /
HURTLEY, Paul 6 Craven Lane White L Plains, NY 10605 / US | 06 /
SENTHILVELAN, Murugappan 6 Church Street Apartment A Carmel, NY 10512 / US | 07 /
BALZOLA, Pablo C/ Jazmin 16 3A Madrid / ES | [2017/50] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2017/50] | Application number, filing date | 16746967.5 | 25.01.2016 | [2017/50] | WO2016US14733 | Priority number, date | US201562110840P | 02.02.2015 Original published format: US 201562110840 P | US201514727076 | 01.06.2015 Original published format: US201514727076 | [2017/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016126448 | Date: | 11.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3254205 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.08.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/76 | [2017/50] | CPC: |
G06F15/8053 (EP,US);
G06F15/8076 (KR,US);
G06F15/7828 (KR,US);
G06F15/7839 (KR,US);
G06F17/142 (KR,US);
G06F9/3001 (EP,KR,US);
G06F9/30021 (EP,US);
G06F9/30036 (EP,KR,US);
G06F9/30101 (KR,US);
G06F9/30105 (EP);
G06F9/30109 (EP,KR,US);
G06F9/30112 (KR,US);
G06F9/3013 (EP);
G06F9/30141 (KR,US);
G06F9/30149 (US);
G06F9/3016 (EP);
G06F9/3836 (EP,KR,US);
G06F9/3856 (KR,US);
G06F9/3887 (EP,KR,US);
G06F9/3888 (EP,KR,US);
G06F9/461 (US);
G06F9/462 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/50] | Title | German: | ZUM BETRIEB AUF VEKTOREN MIT VARIABLER LÄNGE KONFIGURIERTER VEKTORPROZESSOR MIT VERWENDUNG VON ANWEISUNGEN ZUM KOMBINIEREN UND TEILEN VON VEKTOREN | [2017/50] | English: | VECTOR PROCESSOR CONFIGURED TO OPERATE ON VARIABLE LENGTH VECTORS USING INSTRUCTIONS TO COMBINE AND SPLIT VECTORS | [2017/50] | French: | PROCESSEUR VECTORIEL CONÇU POUR FONCTIONNER SUR DES VECTEURS DE LONGUEUR VARIABLE EN UTILISANT DES INSTRUCTIONS POUR COMBINER ET DIVISER DES VECTEURS | [2017/50] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2017 | Search fee paid | 01.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2017 | Examination requested [2017/50] | 01.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.10.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/52] | 22.08.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2023 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5832288 (WONG RONEY S [US]); | [A]US7793077 (VAN HOOK TIMOTHY J [US], et al); | [XI]US2012254588 (ADRIAN JESUS CORBAL SAN [ES], et al); | [XI]US2013275734 (TOLL BRET L [US], et al) | International search | [XY]US2007143574 (BONEBAKKER JAN L [US], et al); | [A]US2010115232 (JOHNSON TIMOTHY J [US], et al); | [Y]US2012131308 (DEKTER YAAKOV [IL], et al) | by applicant | US2003212876 | US2012254588 | US2013275734 |