EP3253329 - HYDRAULIC URETHRAL OCCLUSIVE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GT Urological, LLC 1313 5th Street SE Minneapolis, MN 55414 / US | [2017/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERSON, David W. 8316 Cherokee Drive N. Brooklyn Park, MN 55428 / US | [2017/50] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [2017/50] | Application number, filing date | 16747106.9 | 02.02.2016 | [2017/50] | WO2016US16153 | Priority number, date | US201562110792P | 02.02.2015 Original published format: US 201562110792 P | [2017/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016126696 | Date: | 11.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3253329 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 11.08.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/00 | [2017/50] | CPC: |
A61F2/004 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/50] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR HYDRAULISCHEN URETHRALEN OKKLUSION | [2017/50] | English: | HYDRAULIC URETHRAL OCCLUSIVE DEVICE | [2017/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF HYDRAULIQUE D'OCCLUSION URÉTRALE | [2017/50] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2017 | Search fee paid | 23.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/50] | 23.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/08] | 28.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/08] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2013274546 (ANDERSON DAVID W [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2011144419 (TIMM RICHARD W [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US2006211913 (DLUGOS DANIEL F [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US4709690 (HABER TERRY M [US]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US2013274546 (ANDERSON DAVID W [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * See paragraphs [0019]-[0060]; claims 1-13; figures 1-8. *; | [A]US2013261386 (CHECHIK JOEL CRAIG [US]) [A] 1-14 * See the whole document. *; | [A]US2012157759 (WIRBISKY ALAN G [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * See the whole document. *; | [A]US5009662 (WALLACE WILLIAM D [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * See the whole document. *; | [A]US6780170 (FAGO FRANK M [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * See the whole document. * |