EP3253709 - CARBON NANOTUBE STRUCTURES AND METHODS FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.03.2022 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nanocomp Technologies, Inc. 57 Daniel Webster Highway Merrimack, NH 03054 / US | [2017/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHAUER, Mark W. 84 Cunningham Pond Rd Peterborough, NH 03458 / US | 02 /
TOWLE, Erick C. 23 Bainbridge Drive Concord, New Hampshire 03301 / US | 03 /
STEPHENSON, Rachel 555 Canal Street 705 Manchester, New Hampshire 03101 / US | [2017/52] |
Former [2017/50] | 01 /
SCHAUER, Mark W. 106 Brush Brook Road Dublin, New Hampshire 03444 / US | ||
02 /
TOWLE, Erick C. 23 Bainbridge Drive Concord, New Hampshire 03301 / US | |||
03 /
STEPHENSON, Rachel 555 Canal Street 705 Manchester, New Hampshire 03101 / US | Representative(s) | Weidner Stern Jeschke Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Wilhelm-Herbst-Straße 5 28359 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/50] | HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 16747187.9 | 03.02.2016 | [2017/50] | WO2016US16362 | Priority number, date | US201562111290P | 03.02.2015 Original published format: US 201562111290 P | [2017/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016126818 | Date: | 11.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3253709 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.08.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B82Y40/00, C01B32/05 | [2017/50] | CPC: |
C25F7/00 (EP,US);
C01B32/17 (EP,US);
C25F1/00 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/50] | Title | German: | KOHLENSTOFFNANORÖHRENSTRUKTUR UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2017/50] | English: | CARBON NANOTUBE STRUCTURES AND METHODS FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF | [2017/50] | French: | STRUCTURES À NANOTUBES DE CARBONE ET PROCÉDÉS DE PRODUCTION DE CEUX-CI | [2017/50] | Entry into regional phase | 07.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 07.08.2017 | Search fee paid | 07.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/50] | 07.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2018 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.04.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2007015710 (UNIV TEXAS [US], et al); | [X]WO2008082609 (GEOHEGAN DAVID BRUCE [US], et al) | International search | [XY]US2004065559 (IIJIMA SUMIO [JP], et al); | [Y]US2009075545 (LASHMORE DAVID S [US], et al); | [XY]CN101451273 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [A]US2010183950 (DAI LIMING [US]); | [Y]US2011110843 (PASQUALI MATTEO [US], et al); | [Y]US2012183770 (BOSNYAK CLIVE P [US], et al); | [A]US2014311921 (HOWARD CHRISTOPHER [GB], et al); |