EP3325337 - MONITORING SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR VESSEL MOORING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technip France 6-8 Allée de L-Arche Faubourg de L'Arche ZAC Danton 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2018/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
O'SULLIVAN, James, Francis, Jr. c/o Technip France 6-8 allee l'Arche Faubourg de l'Arche - ZAC Danton 92400 Courbevoie / FR | 02 /
TCHERNIGUIN, Nicolas c/o Technip France 6-8 allee l'Arche Faubourg de l'Arche - ZAC Danton 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2018/22] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2018/22] | Application number, filing date | 16747657.1 | 14.07.2016 | [2018/22] | WO2016US42214 | Priority number, date | US201514803785 | 20.07.2015 Original published format: US201514803785 | [2018/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017015041 | Date: | 26.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3325337 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3325337 | Date: | 03.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B63B21/00, B63B21/50 | [2018/22] | CPC: |
B63B21/50 (EP,US);
G01C21/20 (US);
G01S19/42 (US);
B63B2021/003 (US);
B63B2021/008 (US);
B63B2021/009 (EP,US);
B63B21/00 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERTÄUEN EINES SCHIFFS | [2018/22] | English: | MONITORING SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR VESSEL MOORING | [2018/22] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE SURVEILLANCE POUR AMARRAGE DE NAVIRE | [2018/22] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/22] | 09.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.07.2016 | AL | 03.07.2019 | AT | 03.07.2019 | CZ | 03.07.2019 | DK | 03.07.2019 | EE | 03.07.2019 | ES | 03.07.2019 | FI | 03.07.2019 | HR | 03.07.2019 | IT | 03.07.2019 | LT | 03.07.2019 | LV | 03.07.2019 | MC | 03.07.2019 | MK | 03.07.2019 | MT | 03.07.2019 | NL | 03.07.2019 | PL | 03.07.2019 | RS | 03.07.2019 | SE | 03.07.2019 | SI | 03.07.2019 | SK | 03.07.2019 | SM | 03.07.2019 | TR | 03.07.2019 | IE | 14.07.2019 | LU | 14.07.2019 | BE | 31.07.2019 | CH | 31.07.2019 | LI | 31.07.2019 | FR | 03.09.2019 | BG | 03.10.2019 | IS | 03.11.2019 | PT | 04.11.2019 | DE | 01.02.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 14.07.2016 | |
AL | 03.07.2019 | ||
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
MT | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SI | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IE | 14.07.2019 | ||
LU | 14.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 03.09.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
DE | 01.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 14.07.2016 | |
AL | 03.07.2019 | ||
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SI | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IE | 14.07.2019 | ||
LU | 14.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 03.09.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
DE | 01.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SI | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IE | 14.07.2019 | ||
LU | 14.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 03.09.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
DE | 01.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IE | 14.07.2019 | ||
LU | 14.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 03.09.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
DE | 01.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LU | 14.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
DE | 01.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LU | 14.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
DE | 01.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
DE | 01.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
DE | 01.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 03.07.2019 | |
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 03.07.2019 | |
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | NL | 03.07.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5222453 (CHABOT LUC G [US]) [A] 1,12-14 * column 4, line 19 - column 7, line 16; figures 3,4 *; | [A]WO9954198 (NOVELLENT TECHNOLOGIES L L C [US]) [A] 1-14 * page 4, line 21 - line 30 * * page 5, line 14 - line 23 * * claims 17-19,22,23 * * figures 2a-2c * * figures 3-36 *; | [A]US2009084302 (DARAN RENAUD [FR], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0017] , [0019] , [0020]; figure - * * claims 1,7 *; | [AD]US2010186652 (MARTIN DANIEL GARY [GB]) [AD] 1,12-14* paragraphs [0048] - [0050] * |