EP3289162 - ICE DRILL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.02.2020 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JOHANN EBERHARD GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H. Johann Eberhard Platz 1 8503 St. Josef / AT | [2018/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EBERHARD, Andreas St. Josef 59C 8503 St. Josef / AT | [2018/10] | Representative(s) | Gibler & Poth Patentanwälte KG Dorotheergasse 7/14 1010 Wien / AT | [2018/10] | Application number, filing date | 16747869.2 | 14.07.2016 | [2018/10] | WO2016EP66780 | Priority number, date | AT20150000500 | 27.07.2015 Original published format: AT 5002015 | [2018/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017016890 | Date: | 02.02.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3289162 | Date: | 07.03.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3289162 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | E21B7/00, E21B10/44, E21B17/22 | [2018/10] | CPC: |
E21B7/008 (EP,AT);
E21B10/44 (EP,AT);
E21B17/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EISBOHRER | [2018/10] | English: | ICE DRILL | [2018/10] | French: | FORET À GLACE | [2018/10] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.05.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/10] | 27.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.07.2016 | AL | 10.04.2019 | CY | 10.04.2019 | CZ | 10.04.2019 | DK | 10.04.2019 | EE | 10.04.2019 | ES | 10.04.2019 | FI | 10.04.2019 | HR | 10.04.2019 | LT | 10.04.2019 | LV | 10.04.2019 | MC | 10.04.2019 | MK | 10.04.2019 | MT | 10.04.2019 | NL | 10.04.2019 | PL | 10.04.2019 | RO | 10.04.2019 | RS | 10.04.2019 | SI | 10.04.2019 | SK | 10.04.2019 | SM | 10.04.2019 | TR | 10.04.2019 | BG | 10.07.2019 | GR | 11.07.2019 | IE | 14.07.2019 | LU | 14.07.2019 | BE | 31.07.2019 | IS | 10.08.2019 | PT | 10.09.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 14.07.2016 | |
AL | 10.04.2019 | ||
CY | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
MC | 10.04.2019 | ||
MT | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SI | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IE | 14.07.2019 | ||
LU | 14.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 14.07.2016 | |
AL | 10.04.2019 | ||
CY | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
MC | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SI | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IE | 14.07.2019 | ||
LU | 14.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
CY | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
MC | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SI | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IE | 14.07.2019 | ||
LU | 14.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
MC | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SI | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IE | 14.07.2019 | ||
LU | 14.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
MC | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SI | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
LU | 14.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
MC | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
MC | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 10.04.2019 | |
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 10.04.2019 | |
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | NL | 10.04.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US5213170 (SAVITSKI RICHARD H [US]) [X] 1,2,7,11,15 * column 2, lines 19-54; figures 1-4 * [I] 3-6,8-10,12-14,16-18; | [XI]WO2006062453 (MORA OF SWEDEN AB [SE], et al) [X] 1,2,7,11,15 * page 7, line 33 - page 8, line 21; figures 1-8 *[I] 3-6,8-10,12-14,16-18; | [XI]US2006254818 (PEPPLE GREGORY A [US]) [X] 1,2,7,11,15 * paragraphs [0031] , [ 0032]; figures 1-6 * [I] 3-6,8-10,12-14,16-18; | [XI]US7946355 (KLUGE DOUGLAS J [US]) [X] 1,2,7,11,15 * column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 44 * * column 5, lines 11-30; figures 1-18 * [I] 3-6,8-10,12-14,16-18 |