|
29.11.2023 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2023 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2023 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2023 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.01.2023 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.12.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2022 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.12.2022 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.12.2022 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.10.2022 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.10.2022 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.10.2022 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2022 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
13.10.2022 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
11.10.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2022 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2022 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2022 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.2021 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2021 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2021 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.03.2021 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2021 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2021 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2021 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.01.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2021 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.12.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2020 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
09.12.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.12.2020 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.12.2020 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.04.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.04.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.01.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.01.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.01.2020 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2019 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2019 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2018 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2018 |
Reply to invitation to file a copy of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2018 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2018 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.08.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.08.2018 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
24.08.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
24.08.2018 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.08.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.05.2018 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2018 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.02.2018 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
30.01.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.01.2018 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.12.2017 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.02.2017 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
23.02.2017 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
02.02.2017 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.02.2017 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.02.2017 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
28.10.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
28.10.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
28.10.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
08.09.2016 |
Incoming letter related to PCT RO |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
02.09.2016 |
Communication in cases for which no other form is available |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
16.08.2016 |
Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date |
PCT receiving Office |
9 |
|
10.08.2016 |
Incoming letter related to PCT RO |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
26.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
26.07.2016 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
26.07.2016 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |
|
26.07.2016 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
29 |
|
26.07.2016 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
26.07.2016 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
3 |
|
26.07.2016 |
Electronic request for grant of an International application |
PCT receiving Office |
8 |
|
26.07.2016 |
Electronic request for grant of an International application |
PCT receiving Office |
8 |
|
26.07.2016 |
Substitute sheet (R26) Request |
PCT receiving Office |
8 |