12.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
24.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] |
10.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] |
29.03.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] |
01.03.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] |
09.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
01.12.2023 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 03.01.2024 [2024/01] |
10.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] |
03.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.12.2023 [2023/49] |
27.10.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] |
13.10.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2023 [2023/46] |
25.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.09.2023 [2023/39] |
18.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2023 [2023/38] |
11.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.09.2023 [2023/37] |
04.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.09.2023 [2023/36] |
28.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] |
21.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.08.2023 [2023/34] |
14.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
30.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.08.2023 [2023/31] |
14.04.2023 |
Change - representative |
|
17.03.2023 |
Change - representative |
|
23.12.2022 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 25.01.2023 [2023/04] |
16.12.2022 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
16.12.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
16.12.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
09.12.2022 |
Change - applicant |
|
12.10.2022 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
01.08.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.06.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.04.2021 |
Change - inventor |
published on 12.05.2021 [2021/19] |
12.03.2021 |
Change - applicant |
published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] |
12.03.2021 |
Change - inventor |
published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] |
27.07.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.04.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
24.01.2020 |
First examination report |
|
22.01.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.07.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.10.2018 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] |
05.10.2018 |
Change - extension states |
published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] |
27.08.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
11.07.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.05.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] |
04.05.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
04.05.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] |
10.04.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.02.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.01.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
30.01.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.02.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.02.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.08.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|