Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11957849 | Global Dossier | 16.04.2024 | B2 | US2020406013 | 31.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202017018285 | 11.09.2020 | US201815748240 | 29.01.2018 | DE102015112388 | 29.07.2015 | DE102015117923 | 21.10.2015 | WO2016EP67785 | 26.07.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10806902 | Global Dossier | 20.10.2020 | B2 | US2018214674 | 02.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102015112388 | 29.07.2015 | DE102015117923 | 21.10.2015 | WO2016EP67785 | 26.07.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20180037216 | Global Dossier | 11.04.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102015112388 | 29.07.2015 | DE102015117923 | 21.10.2015 | WO2016EP67785 | 26.07.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7315915B | Global Dossier | 27.07.2023 | B2 | JP2021104346 | 26.07.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2018524543 | 26.07.2016 | DE102015112388 | 29.07.2015 | DE102015117923 | 21.10.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2018528040 | Global Dossier | 27.09.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102015112388 | 29.07.2015 | DE102015117923 | 21.10.2015 | WO2016EP67785 | 26.07.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN117137591 | Global Dossier | 01.12.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201680044512 | 26.07.2016 | DE102015112388 | 29.07.2015 | DE102015117923 | 21.10.2015 | WO2016EP67785 | 26.07.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107847714 | Global Dossier | 27.03.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102015112388 | 29.07.2015 | DE102015117923 | 21.10.2015 | WO2016EP67785 | 26.07.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3030977 | Global Dossier | 02.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102015112388 | 29.07.2015 | DE102015117923 | 21.10.2015 | WO2016EP67785 | 26.07.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2016299343B | Global Dossier | 24.09.2020 | B2 | AU2016299343 | 22.02.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102015112388 | 29.07.2015 | DE102015117923 | 21.10.2015 | WO2016EP67785 | 26.07.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3328478 | Global Dossier | 25.01.2023 | B1 | EP3328478 | 06.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102015112388 | 29.07.2015 | DE102015117923 | 21.10.2015 | WO2016EP67785 | 26.07.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112018001895 | 11.04.2023 | B8 | BR112018001895 | 09.08.2022 | B1 | BR112018001895 | 25.09.2018 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102015112388 | 29.07.2015 | DE102015117923 | 21.10.2015 | WO2016EP67785 | 26.07.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102015117923 | 02.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102015112388 | 29.07.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017017095 | Global Dossier | 02.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102015112388 | 29.07.2015 | DE102015117923 | 21.10.2015 |