|
03.03.2023 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2022 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2022 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.03.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2022 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2022 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.03.2022 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.03.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.01.2022 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.01.2022 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.01.2022 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2022 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
77 |
|
05.01.2022 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
77 |
|
27.10.2021 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2021 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.2021 |
Document concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.12.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.12.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.12.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.08.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
25.08.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.03.2020 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2020 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.06.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.06.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.06.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.06.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.06.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.02.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.02.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.07.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2018 |
Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.06.2018 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.06.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2018 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2018 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.03.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2018 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
23.01.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.2018 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.01.2018 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.12.2017 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.03.2017 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
94 |
|
01.03.2017 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
79 |
|
09.02.2017 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.02.2017 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
82 |
|
20.10.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
20.10.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
20.10.2016 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
4 |