EP3232722 - WIRELESS COMMUNICATION CONTROL SYSTEM, WIRELESS COMMUNICATION CONTROL DEVICE, AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.08.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.09.2018 [2018/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Omron Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [2017/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UEKI Daichi c/o OMRON Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | 02 /
SAITO Keisuke c/o OMRON Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [2017/42] | Representative(s) | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Schmid-Dreyer Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theresienhöhe 12 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/42] | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Patentanwälte PartG mbB Ganghoferstrasse 29a 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16749104.2 | 03.02.2016 | [2017/42] | WO2016JP53146 | Priority number, date | JP20150026981 | 13.02.2015 Original published format: JP 2015026981 | [2017/42] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016129460 | Date: | 18.08.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3232722 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.08.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, H04B17/345, H04W24/00, H04W52/02, H04B17/382, H04W24/08 | [2018/13] | CPC: |
H04W72/04 (EP,US);
H04B1/0475 (US);
H04B17/345 (EP,US);
H04B17/382 (EP,US);
H04W24/00 (EP,US);
H04W24/08 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/42] | H04W72/04, H04B17/345, H04W24/00, H04W52/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/42] | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSTEUERUNGSSYSTEM, DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND DRAHTKOMMUNIKATIONSSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2017/42] | English: | WIRELESS COMMUNICATION CONTROL SYSTEM, WIRELESS COMMUNICATION CONTROL DEVICE, AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION CONTROL METHOD | [2017/42] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CONTRÔLE DE COMMUNICATIONS SANS FIL, DISPOSITIF DE CONTRÔLE DE COMMUNICATIONS SANS FIL, ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONTRÔLE DE COMMUNICATIONS SANS FIL | [2017/42] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2017 | Translation filed | 13.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2017 | Search fee paid | 13.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/42] | 13.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.07.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2008167139 (DENSO CORP) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0011] *; | [A]JP2012005086 (NTT DOCOMO INC, et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]JP2013183202 (PANASONIC CORP) [A] 1-13* abstract *; | [A]JP2013225816 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0033] * | International search | [A]JP2001298763 (SONY CORP) [A] 1-13 * , paragraphs [0066], [0086] & US 2001/0039183 A1 paragraphs [0187], [0208] *; | [A]JP2006217347 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-13* , paragraphs [0028], [0034] & US 2006/0192708 A1 paragraphs [0075], [0085] *; | [XY]JP2012005086 (NTT DOCOMO INC, et al) [X] 1-8, 10, 11, 13 * , paragraphs [0021] to [0029] & US 2013/0090127 A1 paragraphs [0046] to [0054] & WO 2011/162395 A1 * [Y] 9, 12; | [Y]JP2013183202 (PANASONIC CORP) [Y] 9, 12 * , paragraphs [0026] to [0029] (Family: none) * |