Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10302178 | Global Dossier | 28.05.2019 | B2 | US2017335930 | 23.11.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514619990 | 11.02.2015 | US201715672667 | 09.08.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2976232 | Global Dossier | 28.11.2023 | C | CA2976232 | 18.08.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514619990 | 11.02.2015 | WO2016US17222 | 10.02.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3256756 | Global Dossier | 14.12.2022 | B1 | EP3256756 | 17.10.2018 | A4 | EP3256756 | 20.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514619990 | 11.02.2015 | WO2016US17222 | 10.02.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016130601 | Global Dossier | 18.08.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514619990 | 11.02.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9765863 | Global Dossier | 19.09.2017 | B2 | US2016230857 | 11.08.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514619990 | 11.02.2015 |