EP3261437 - FUNGICIDAL COMPOUNDS AND COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AgroFresh Inc. 510-530 Walnut Street, Suite 1350 Philadelphia, PA 19106 / US | [2018/19] |
Former [2018/01] | For all designated states AgroFresh Inc. 400 Arcola Road P.O. Box 7000 Collegeville, PA 19426 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JACOBSON, Richard M. 11 Deerpath Road Chalfont, Pennsylvania 18914 / US | [2018/01] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/01] | HGF Limited 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | Application number, filing date | 16749789.0 | 10.02.2016 | [2018/01] | WO2016US17326 | Priority number, date | US201562115174P | 12.02.2015 Original published format: US 201562115174 P | [2018/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016130658 | Date: | 18.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3261437 | Date: | 03.01.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3261437 | Date: | 11.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.08.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07F5/02, A01N55/08, A23B4/20, A23B7/154, A23L3/3463 | [2018/36] | CPC: |
A01N55/08 (EP,KR,US);
A23B4/20 (EP,KR,US);
A23B7/154 (EP,KR,US);
A23L3/3463 (EP,KR,US);
A23L3/3544 (KR);
C07F5/02 (EP,US);
C07F5/025 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/01] | A01N27/00, A01N55/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FUNGIZIDE VERBINDUNGEN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2018/01] | English: | FUNGICIDAL COMPOUNDS AND COMPOSITIONS | [2018/01] | French: | COMPOSÉS ET COMPOSITIONS FONGICIDES | [2018/01] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2017 | Search fee paid | 05.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2017 | Examination requested [2018/01] | 05.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.02.2016 | AL | 11.09.2019 | CY | 11.09.2019 | CZ | 11.09.2019 | DK | 11.09.2019 | EE | 11.09.2019 | FI | 11.09.2019 | LT | 11.09.2019 | LV | 11.09.2019 | MC | 11.09.2019 | MK | 11.09.2019 | MT | 11.09.2019 | RO | 11.09.2019 | SE | 11.09.2019 | SI | 11.09.2019 | SK | 11.09.2019 | SM | 11.09.2019 | BG | 11.12.2019 | NO | 11.12.2019 | IS | 12.01.2020 | LU | 10.02.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 10.02.2016 | |
AL | 11.09.2019 | ||
CY | 11.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
MC | 11.09.2019 | ||
MT | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
LU | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
MC | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
LU | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
LU | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | FI | 11.09.2019 | |
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 11.09.2019 | |
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 11.09.2019 | |
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 11.09.2019 | |
NO | 11.12.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2013050591 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-15 * claim 1 *; | [AP]WO2015175157 (DOW AGROSCIENCES LLC [US]) [AP] 1-15* claim 1 * | International search | [A]US2009239824 (LEE VING [US], et al) [A] 1-41 * ; paragraph [0215], see compound 42 *; | [A]US2011190235 (CHEN DAITAO [US], et al) [A] 1-41 * ; paragraph [0345] *; | [A]US2011237547 (MAYER FRIEDRICH KARL [CH]) [A] 1-41* ; paragraph [0015] *; | [A]US2014349853 (MACLEAN DANIEL [US], et al) [A] 1-41 * ; paragraph [0198], Table 8, page 23, see compound 132; claim 1 * |