EP3256495 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR COMBINATION THERAPY WITH PROSTATE-SPECIFIC MEMBRANE ANTIGEN BINDING PROTEINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.11.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aptevo Research and Development LLC 2401 Fourth Avenue Suite 1050 Seattle, Washington 98121 / US | [2017/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLANKENSHIP, John c/o EMERGENT PRODUCT DEVELOPMENT SEATTLE LLC 2401 Fourth Ave. Suite 1050 Seattle, Washington 98121 / US | 02 /
SEWELL, Elaine Todd c/o EMERGENT PRODUCT DEVELOPMENT SEATTLE LLC 2401 Fourth Ave. Suite 1050 Seattle, Washington 98121 / US | [2017/51] | Representative(s) | Walker, Ross Thomson Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [2017/51] | Application number, filing date | 16749890.6 | 11.02.2016 | [2017/51] | WO2016US17568 | Priority number, date | US201562114871P | 11.02.2015 Original published format: US 201562114871 P | [2017/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2016130819 | Date: | 18.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3256495 | Date: | 20.12.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.09.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/40, C07K16/30, A61K39/395, C07K16/28, A61K45/06, A61K31/58, A61K31/496, A61K31/4439, A61K31/4188, A61K31/4166, A61K39/00, A61P35/00 | [2018/38] | CPC: |
C07K16/3069 (EP,US);
A61K31/4166 (EP,US);
A61K31/4188 (EP,US);
A61K31/4439 (EP,US);
A61K31/496 (EP,US);
A61K31/58 (EP,US);
A61K39/39558 (US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
C07K16/2809 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (US);
C07K2317/24 (US);
C07K2317/31 (EP,US);
C07K2317/522 (US);
C07K2317/53 (US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4166, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/4188, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/4439, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/496, A61K2300/00 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2017/51] | C07K16/40, C07K16/30, A61K39/395 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/51] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR KOMBINATIONSTHERAPIE MIT PROSTATASPEZIFISCHEN MEMBRANANTIGENBINDENDEN PROTEINEN | [2017/51] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR COMBINATION THERAPY WITH PROSTATE-SPECIFIC MEMBRANE ANTIGEN BINDING PROTEINS | [2017/51] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET MÉTHODES DE POLYTHÉRAPIE COMBINÉES À DES PROTÉINES SE LIANT À L'ANTIGÈNE MEMBRANAIRE SPÉCIFIQUE DE LA PROSTATE | [2017/51] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2017 | Search fee paid | 04.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2017 | Examination requested [2017/51] | 04.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/40] | 08.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2019/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2014099257 (BANDER NEIL H [US]) [X] 1-4,7-9,12-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] - [0014] - [0038] - [0040] * [I] 5,6,10,11,15; | [XI]US2004120958 (BANDER NEIL H [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-9,12-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0017] , [0018] , [0175] * [I] 5,6,10,11,15; | [XI]WO2006110745 (CYTOGEN CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-9,12-14 * abstract * * page 8, line 12 - line 28 * * page 15, line 31 - page 16, line 12 * [I] 5,6,10,11,15 | [XI] - JOSE D. MURGA ET AL, "Synergistic co-targeting of prostate-specific membrane antigen and androgen receptor in prostate cancer", PROSTATE., US, (20141018), vol. 75, no. 3, doi:10.1002/pros.22910, ISSN 0270-4137, pages 242 - 254, XP055259705 [X] 1-4,7-9,12-14 * abstract * * Conclusions * [I] 5,6,10,11,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/pros.22910 | International search | [XY]WO2009046294 (UNIV CORNELL [US], et al) [X] 1-3, 46, 47, 59-61, 64/59-61, 67 * ; paragraphs [0078], [00109], [00104], [00106], [00108], [00111]; claim 1 * [Y] 4-8, 9/7-8, 10/9/7-8, 23, 24, 26-30, 33-35, 36/33-35, 37-39, 41, 43, 49/43, 53/43, 54/53/43, 62, 63, 64/62-63, 68-69, 70/67-69, 73; | [Y]US2014161800 (BLANKENSHIP JOHN W [US], et al) [Y] 4-8, 9/7-8, 10/9/7-8, 23, 24, 26-30, 33-35, 36/33-35, 37-39, 43, 49/43, 53/43, 54/53/43, 70/67-69, 73 * ; Figure 2A; paragraphs [0009]-[0015], [0023], [0025], [0029]-[0033], [0037], [0045], [0046], [0049], [0074], [0110], [0122], [0123], [0134], [0248], [0251]; pages 77-79; Claim 186 *; | [Y]WO2010037836 (MICROMET AG [DE], et al) [Y] 41 * ; Claim 11 *; | [Y]WO2014043208 (MEDIVATION PROSTATE THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) [Y] 62, 64/62, 69, 70/69 * ; paragraph [15] *; | [Y] - STEIN, MN et al., "Androgen Synthesis Inhibitors in the Treatment of Castration-Resistant Prostate Cancer.", Asian Journal of Andrology., (20100418), vol. 16, pages 387 - 400, XP055316057 [Y] 68 * ; abstract. DOI: 10.4103/1008-682X.129133 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4103/1008-682X.129133 | [Y] - CRAWFORD, ED et al., "The Role of LHRH Antagonists in the Treatment of Prostate Cancer.", Oncology., (20090600), vol. 23, no. 7, pages 662 - 630, XP055316059 [Y] 64/59-63 * ; page 2, second paragraph * | [Y] - CHAKRAVARTY, D et al., "The Oestrogen Receptor Alpha-Regulated IncRNA NEAT1 is a Critical Modulator of Prostate Cancer.", Nature Communications., (20141121), vol. 5, no. 5383, XP055231010 [Y] 63, 64/63 * ; figure 1; page 2, second column, second paragraph. DOI: 10.1038/ncomms6383 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ncomms6383 | [Y] - CHOU, TC, "Drug Combination Studies and Their Synergy Quantification Using the Chou-Talalay Method.", Cancer Research, (20100115), vol. 70, no. 2, pages 440 - 446, XP055169871 [Y] 73 * ; abstract. DOI: 10.1158/0008-5472 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-09-1947 |