EP3256493 - COMBINATION THERAPY USING A CD19-ADC AND VINCRISTINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.11.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seattle Genetics, Inc. 21823 30th Drive, S.E. Bothell, WA 98021 / US | [2017/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAW, Che-Leung 21823 30th Drive SE Bothell, Washington 98021 / US | 02 /
STONE, Ivan 21823 30th Drive SE Bothell, Washington 98021 / US | [2017/51] | Representative(s) | Gowshall, Jonathan Vallance Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [2017/51] | Application number, filing date | 16749948.2 | 12.02.2016 | [2017/51] | WO2016US17721 | Priority number, date | US201562115381P | 12.02.2015 Original published format: US 201562115381 P | [2017/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016130902 | Date: | 18.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3256493 | Date: | 20.12.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.08.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, A61K39/395, A61P35/02 | [2017/51] | CPC: |
A61K31/475 (EP,US);
A61K39/39558 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/573 (EP,US);
A61K31/675 (EP,US);
A61K31/704 (EP,US);
A61K38/06 (EP,US);
A61K47/6803 (KR);
A61K47/68031 (EP,US);
A61K47/6849 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/6867 (US);
A61P35/02 (EP,KR);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K16/2803 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2300/00 (KR);
C07K2317/24 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K39/39558, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/51] | Title | German: | KOMBINATIONSTHERAPIE MIT CD19-ADC UND VINCRISTIN | [2017/51] | English: | COMBINATION THERAPY USING A CD19-ADC AND VINCRISTINE | [2017/51] | French: | POLYTHÉRAPIE UTILISANT UN CONJUGUÉ ANTICORPS-MÉDICAMENT ANTI-CD19 (CD19-ADC) ET DE LA VINCRISTINE | [2017/51] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2017 | Search fee paid | 06.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2017 | Examination requested [2017/51] | 06.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/31] | 07.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/31] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 11.04.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 11.04.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.04.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2009052431 (SEATTLE GENETICS INC [US], et al); | International search | [Y]WO2006020618 (INEX PHARMACEUTICALS CORP [CA], et al); | [A]US2011104150 (TEDDER THOMAS F [US], et al); | [XY]US7968687 (MCDONAGH CHARLOTTE [US], et al); |