EP3256216 - MILRINONE COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR ADMINISTERING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.07.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.11.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vanderbilt University 305 Kirkland Hall 2201 West End Avenue Nashville, TN 37240 / US | For all designated states Cumberland Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 2525 West End Avenue, Suite 950 Nashville, TN 37203 / US | [2023/36] |
Former [2017/51] | For all designated states Vanderbilt University 305 Kirkland Hall Nashville, TN 37240 / US | ||
For all designated states Cumberland Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 2525 West End Avenue, Suite 950 Nashville, TN 37203 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAGLUND, Nicholas A. 2200 W. 47th Place, Apt. 403 Westwood, Kansas 66205 / US | 02 /
COX, Zachary 313 Goldenrod Court Nashville, Tennessee 37221 / US | 03 /
PAVLIV, Leo 707 Walcott Way Cary, North Carolina 27519 / US | 04 /
VILA, Andrew 736 Harpeth Bend Drive Nashville, Tennessee 37221 / US | [2018/03] |
Former [2017/51] | 01 /
HAGLUND, Nicholas A. 231 Cherokee Road Nashville, Tennessee 37205 / US | ||
02 /
COX, Zachary 313 Goldenrod Court Nashville, Tennessee 37221 / US | |||
03 /
PAVLIV, Leo 707 Walcott Way Cary, North Carolina 27519 / US | |||
04 /
VILA, Andrew 736 Harpeth Bend Drive Nashville, Tennessee 37221 / US | Representative(s) | Kransell & Wennborg KB P.O. Box 27834 115 93 Stockholm / SE | [2017/51] | Application number, filing date | 16750064.4 | 16.02.2016 | [2017/51] | WO2016US18055 | Priority number, date | US201562115798P | 13.02.2015 Original published format: US 201562115798 P | [2017/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016131051 | Date: | 18.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3256216 | Date: | 20.12.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3256216 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.08.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61P9/10, A61M11/02, A61K9/12, A61K31/444, A61K47/12 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
A61K9/0078 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/444 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/12 (EP,US);
A61M11/005 (KR,US);
A61M15/0085 (US);
A61M16/14 (US);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61M11/00 (EP,US);
A61M11/006 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2018/34] | A61P9/10, A61M11/02, A61K9/12 | ||
Former IPC [2017/51] | A61P9/10, A61M11/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MILRINONZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERABREICHUNG DAVON | [2017/51] | English: | MILRINONE COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR ADMINISTERING SAME | [2017/51] | French: | COMPOSITION DE MILRINONE ET SON PROCÉDÉ D'ADMINISTRATION | [2017/51] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2017 | Search fee paid | 12.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2017 | Examination requested [2017/51] | 12.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.09.2023 | CZ | 06.09.2023 | EE | 06.09.2023 | ES | 06.09.2023 | FI | 06.09.2023 | HR | 06.09.2023 | IT | 06.09.2023 | LT | 06.09.2023 | LV | 06.09.2023 | NL | 06.09.2023 | PL | 06.09.2023 | RO | 06.09.2023 | RS | 06.09.2023 | SE | 06.09.2023 | SK | 06.09.2023 | SM | 06.09.2023 | NO | 06.12.2023 | GR | 07.12.2023 | IS | 06.01.2024 | PT | 08.01.2024 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
NL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 06.09.2023 | |
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2005049174 (DENAULT ANDRE [CA]) [X] 13-15 * paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0075] * * paragraph [0078] * * figure - * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0080] * [Y] 1-12; | [Y]WO2008005053 (CYDEX INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * claims 1,30,31 * * page 90, line 25 - page 93, line 7 * * example 10 *; | [I]US7348362 (BANERJEE PARTHA S [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * column 13, line 3 - line 37 * * column 16, line 60 - line 62 * * example 1 ** claim - * | International search | [Y]US2005049174 (DENAULT ANDRE [CA]) [Y] 1-12, 13/1-12, 14/13/1-12, 15/13/1-12, 16-17, 28-41 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0059], [0175], [0186] *; | [Y]US2006030611 (BRISTOW MICHAEL [US], et al) [Y] 30, 33* ; paragraph [0020] *; | [Y]US2006140873 (CHANG HENG W [US]) [Y] 8-12, 13/8-12, 14/13/1-12, 15/13/8-12, 41 * ; paragraphs [0007]-[0008], [0016], [0018] *; | [Y]US2011008325 (PIPKIN JAMES D [US], et al) [Y] 1-12, 13/1-12, 14/13/1-12, 15/13/1-12, 16-17, 28-41 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0071], [0074]-[0075], [0078], [0081], [0106], [0109], [0150]-[0152], [0206], [0212], [0220], [0226], [0231], [0272] * | by applicant | US4413127 | US5758637 | US2005049174 | US6983747 | US7059320 | US7322349 | - KIRKLIN JKNAFTEL DCPAGANI FDKORMOS RLSTEVENSON LWBLUME ED et al., "Sixth INTERMACS annual report: A 10,000-patient database", J Heart Lung Transplant, (20140600), vol. 33, no. 6, doi:10.1016/j.healun.2014.04.010, pages 555 - 64, XP029026644 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.healun.2014.04.010 | - KORMOS RLTEUTEBERG JJPAGANI FDRUSSELL SDJOHN RMILLER LW et al., "Right ventricular failure in patients with the HeartMate II continuous-flow left ventricular assist device: Incidence, risk factors, and effect on outcomes", J Thorac Cardiovasc Surg, (20100500), vol. 139, no. 5, pages 1316 - 24, XP027012337 | - MILLER LWLIETZ K, "Candidate selection for long-term left ventricular assist device therapy for refractory heart failure", J Heart Lung Transplant, (20070700), vol. 25, no. 7, doi:10.1016/j.healun.2006.03.007, pages 756 - 64, XP025015203 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.healun.2006.03.007 | - JOHN RPAGANI FDNAKA YBOYLE ACONTE JVRUSSELL SD et al., "Post-cardiac transplant survival after support with a continuous-flow left ventricular assist device: Impact of duration of left ventricular assist device support and other variables", J Thorac Cardiovasc Surg, (20100700), vol. 140, no. 1, pages 174 - 81, XP027088885 | - POTAPOV EMEYER DSWAMINATHAN MRAMSAY MEL BANAYOSY ADIEHL C et al., "Inhaled nitric oxide after left ventricular assist device implantation: A prospective, randomized, double-blind, multicenter, placebo-controlled trial", J Heart Lung Transplant, (20110800), vol. 30, no. 8, pages 870 - 8 | - HASENFUSS GTEERLINK JR, "Cardiac inotropes: Current agents and future directions", Eur Heart J, (20110800), vol. 32, no. 15, pages 1838 - 45 | - FELKER GMBENZA RLCHANDLER ABLEIMBERGER JDCUFFE MSCALIFF RM et al., "Heart failure etiology and response to milrinone in decompensated heart failure: Results from the OPTIME-CHF study", J Am Coll Cardiol, (20030319), vol. 41, no. 6, pages 997 - 1003 | - HARALDSSON SAKIELER-JENSEN NRICKSTEN SE, "The additive pulmonary vasodilatory effects of inhaled prostacyclin and inhaled milrinone in postcardiac surgical patients with pulmonary hypertension", Anesth Analg, (20011200), vol. 93, no. 6, page 1439 | - SABLOTZKI ASTARZMANN WSCHEUBEL RGROND SCZESLICK EG, "Selective pulmonary vasodilation with inhaled aerosolized milrinone in heart transplant candidates", Can J Anaesth, (20051200), no. 10, pages 1076 - 82 | - WANG HGONG MZHOU BDAI A, "Comparison of inhaled and intravenous milrinone in patients with pulmonary hypertension undergoing mitral valve surgery", Adv Ther, (20090400), vol. 26, no. 4, doi:10.1007/s12325-009-0019-4, pages 462 - 8, XP037138347 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s12325-009-0019-4 | - SINGH RCHOUDHURY MSAXENA AKAPOOR PMJUNEJA RKIRAN U, "Inhaled nitroglycerin versus inhaled milrinone in children with congenital heart disease suffering from pulmonary artery hypertension", J Cardiothorac Vasc Anesth, (20101000), vol. 24, no. 5, pages 797 - 801 | - BUCKLEY MSFELDMAN JP, "Nebulized milrinone use in a pulmonary hypertensive crisis", Pharmacotherapy, (20121200), vol. 27, no. 12, pages 1763 - 6 | - FITZPATRICK JR,3RDFREDERICK JRHSU VMKOZIN EDO'HARA MLHOWELL E et al., "Risk score derived from pre-operative data analysis predicts the need for biventricular mechanical circulatory support", J Heart Lung Transplant, (20081200), vol. 27, no. 12, doi:10.1016/j.healun.2008.09.006, pages 1286 - 92, XP025743953 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.healun.2008.09.006 | - NGUYEN AQTHEORET YCHEN CDENAULT AVARIN F, "High performance liquid chromatography using UV detection for the quantification of milrinone in plasma: Improved sensitivity for inhalation", J Chromatogr B Analyt Technol Biomed Life Sci, (20090301), vol. 877, no. 7, doi:10.1016/j.jchromb.2009.01.024, pages 657 - 60, XP025952196 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jchromb.2009.01.024 | - HAGLUND NALUETHGE MDURYEE MHUNTER CALNOUTI YCORCORAN TBECK JMALTAIS SLENIHAN DUM J, Pre-Clinical Testing of Aerosolized Inhaled Milrinone Using a Vibrating Mesh Nebulizer, (20130400), pages S252 - S253 | - MATTHEWS JCKOELLING TMPAGANI FDAARONSON KD, "The right ventricular failure risk score a pre-operative tool for assessing the risk of right ventricular failure in left ventricular assist device candidates", J Am Coll Cardiol, (20080603), vol. 51, no. 22, doi:10.1016/j.jacc.2008.03.009, pages 2163 - 72, XP029652132 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jacc.2008.03.009 | - JASKI BEFIFER MAWRIGHT RFBRAUNWALD ECOLUCCI WS, "Positive inotropic and vasodilator actions of milrinone in patients with severe congestive heart failure. dose-response relationships and comparison to nitroprusside", J Clin Invest, (19850200), vol. 75, no. 2, pages 643 - 9 | - VAZIR ALEAVER NLYSTER HALEXANIAN AWILTON PBANNER NR, "Is monitoring milrinone therapy useful in advanced heart failure?", Int J Cardiol, (20110616), vol. 149, no. 3, doi:10.1016/j.ijcard.2011.02.068, pages 380 - 1, XP028226769 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijcard.2011.02.068 | - CHARISOPOULOU DLEAVER NBANNER NR, "Milrinone in advanced heart failure: Dose and therapeutic monitor outside intensive care unit", Angiology, (20140400), vol. 65, no. 4, pages 343 - 9 | - COX ZLCALCUTT MWMORRISON TBAKERS WSDAVIS MBLENIHAN DJ, "Elevation of plasma milrinone concentrations in stage D heart failure associated with renal dysfunction", J Cardiovasc Pharmacol Ther, (20130900), vol. 18, no. 5, pages 433 - 8 |