EP3256138 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING MELOXICAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.01.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.11.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: AL | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Axsome Therapeutics, Inc. 22 Cortlandt Street, 16th Floor New York, NY 10007 / US | [2022/08] |
Former [2020/49] | For all designated states Axsome Therapeutics, Inc. 22 Cortlandt Street, 16th Floor New York, NY 10007 / US | ||
Former [2019/27] | For all designated states Axsome Therapeutics, Inc. 200 Broadway, 3rd Floor New York, NY 10038 / US | ||
Former [2017/51] | For all designated states Axsome Therapeutics, Inc. 25 Broadway, 9th Floor New York, New York 10004 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TABUTEAU, Herriot 22 Cortlandt Street, 16th Floor New York, NY 10007 / US | [2020/49] |
Former [2017/51] | 01 /
TABUTEAU, Herriot 25 Broadway 9th Floor New York, New York 10004 / US | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/08] | Mitchell, Simon James Murgitroyd & Company London Euston House 24 Eversholt Street London NW1 1AD / GB | ||
Former [2017/51] | Green, Mark Charles Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Euston House 24 Eversholt Street London NW1 1AD / GB | Application number, filing date | 16750078.4 | 11.04.2016 | [2017/51] | WO2016US26991 | Priority number, date | US201562259993P | 25.11.2015 Original published format: US 201562259993 P | [2018/35] |
Former [2017/51] | US201562114215P | 10.02.2015 | |
US201562259993P | 25.11.2015 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2016131067 | Date: | 18.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3256138 | Date: | 20.12.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3256138 | Date: | 23.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 06.10.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/20, A61K45/06, A61P19/02, A61P29/00, A61K31/4439, A61K31/5415 | [2021/33] | CPC: |
A61K31/5415 (EP,CN,IL,KR);
A61K31/724 (IL);
A61K47/6951 (EP,CN,IL,KR);
A61K31/4439 (EP,CN,IL,KR);
A61K45/00 (CN);
A61K45/06 (EP,IL);
A61K47/02 (EP,CN,KR);
A61K9/0053 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K9/2009 (EP,CN,IL);
A61K9/205 (EP,CN,IL);
A61P19/02 (EP,CN,IL);
A61P29/00 (EP,CN,IL,KR);
A61K2300/00 (IL,KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4439, A61K2300/00 (EP,CN);
A61K31/5415, A61K2300/00 (CN,EP) |
Former IPC [2019/40] | A61K9/20, A61K31/4439, A61K31/5415, A61K45/06 | ||
Former IPC [2017/51] | A61K31/724, A61K31/5415, A61K33/10, A61P19/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT MELOXICAM | [2017/51] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING MELOXICAM | [2017/51] | French: | COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES CONTENANT DU MÉLOXICAM | [2017/51] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2017 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2017 | Search fee paid | 03.08.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2016 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 03.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/51] | 03.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.11.2018 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 0001 | 20.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.01.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Appeal following examination | 18.12.2018 | Appeal received No. J0001/19 | 09.01.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 19.03.2019 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2019/12] | 15.05.2019 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2019/20] | 01.07.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: rejection of appeal | Divisional application(s) | EP22151689.1 / EP4008319 | Opposition(s) | 24.11.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/05] | Request for re-establishment of rights: | 02.10.2017 | Date of receipt | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2024/31] |
Former [2024/23] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
Former [2023/25] | AL | 23.02.2022 | |
IT | 11.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 23.02.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]WO9909988 (HEXAL AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,15 * Claims, in particular claims 1, 2, 6, 7, 20-22; Description page 3 2nd-4th paragraphs, page 4 2nd and 5th paragraphs; Example IV-12 and V-4 * [Y] 11,12,14 [I] 2-10,13; | [Y]WO2005021041 (WEST PHARM SERV DRUG RES LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-15 * Claim 1; Description page 8 lines 7-8, 26-27 and page 9 line 5 *; | [Y]US2005249806 (PROEHL GERALD T [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * Claims, in particular claims 1, 3, 19 and 28; Example 6 Table 6.B *; | [YA]US2007154542 (TANANBAUM JAMES B [US], et al) [Y] 11,12,14 * Claims and examples *[A] 1-10,13,15 | International search | [Y]CA2565941 (EQUITECH CORP [CA]); | [Y]CN102526058 (YINLIN QIN); | [Y]US8835407 (MOSHER GEROLD L [US], et al); | [XY]WO2014161131 (ARISSA PHARMA [CN]) |