EP3308043 - ANGULAR CONTACT BALL BEARING WITH COLD FORMED BEARING RING AS WELL AS METHOD OF MANUFACTURE A BEARING RING OF AN ANGULAR CONTACT BALL BEARING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/16] | ANGULAR CONTACT BALL BEARING HAVING A COLD-FORMED BEARING RING, AND A METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A BEARING RING OF SAID ANGULAR CONTACT BALL BEARING | ||
[2019/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.04.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schaeffler Technologies AG & Co. KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [2018/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KICK-RODENBÜCHER, Reinhard Greuther Str. 18 90455 Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
EIDLOTH, Rainer Straußstr. 4 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | 03 /
MANTAU, Markus Heuberg 17 90617 Puschendorf / DE | [2018/17] | Application number, filing date | 16750091.7 | 08.06.2016 | [2018/16] | WO2016DE200266 | Priority number, date | DE201510210765 | 12.06.2015 Original published format: DE102015210765 | [2018/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016198069 | Date: | 15.12.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3308043 | Date: | 18.04.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3308043 | Date: | 10.08.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F16C19/16, F16C33/64, B21K1/04, B23P13/00 | [2019/16] | CPC: |
F16C19/163 (EP,CN,US);
F16C33/64 (EP,CN,US);
B21K1/04 (EP,US);
F16C33/3806 (EP,US);
F16C33/3856 (EP,US);
F16C2220/46 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2018/16] | F16C19/16, F16C33/64, B21D53/10, B23P13/00, F16C33/58 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHRÄGKUGELLAGER MIT KALTUMGEFORMTEM LAGERRING SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR FERTIGUNG EINES LAGERRINGS DES SCHRÄGKUGELLAGERS | [2018/16] | English: | ANGULAR CONTACT BALL BEARING WITH COLD FORMED BEARING RING AS WELL AS METHOD OF MANUFACTURE A BEARING RING OF AN ANGULAR CONTACT BALL BEARING | [2019/16] | French: | ROULEMENT À CONTACT OBLIQUE AVEC BAGUE DE ROULEMENT FABRIQUÉE PAR FORMAGE À FROID ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION UN BAGUE D'UN ROULEMENT À CONTACT OBLIQUE | [2019/16] |
Former [2018/16] | ANGULAR CONTACT BALL BEARING HAVING A COLD-FORMED BEARING RING, AND A METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A BEARING RING OF SAID ANGULAR CONTACT BALL BEARING | ||
Former [2018/16] | PALIER À BILLES À CONTACT OBLIQUE COMPRENANT UNE BAGUE DE PALIER FORMÉE À FROID ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE BAGUE DE PALIER DU PALIER À BILLES À CONTACT OBLIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2017 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2017 | Examination requested [2018/16] | 11.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.06.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 10.08.2022 | CZ | 10.08.2022 | DK | 10.08.2022 | EE | 10.08.2022 | ES | 10.08.2022 | FI | 10.08.2022 | HR | 10.08.2022 | IT | 10.08.2022 | LT | 10.08.2022 | LV | 10.08.2022 | MC | 10.08.2022 | NL | 10.08.2022 | PL | 10.08.2022 | RO | 10.08.2022 | RS | 10.08.2022 | SE | 10.08.2022 | SI | 10.08.2022 | SK | 10.08.2022 | SM | 10.08.2022 | NO | 10.11.2022 | GR | 11.11.2022 | IS | 10.12.2022 | PT | 12.12.2022 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/09] | AL | 10.08.2022 | |
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
MC | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 10.08.2022 | |
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SI | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 10.08.2022 | |
CZ | 10.08.2022 | ||
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | CZ | 10.08.2022 | |
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
EE | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SK | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | CZ | 10.08.2022 | |
DK | 10.08.2022 | ||
ES | 10.08.2022 | ||
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RO | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 10.08.2022 | |
FI | 10.08.2022 | ||
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 10.08.2022 | |
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
SM | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 10.08.2022 | |
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
IS | 10.12.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | FI | 10.08.2022 | |
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
PL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 10.08.2022 | |
HR | 10.08.2022 | ||
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
GR | 11.11.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 10.08.2022 | |
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
LV | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | ||
PT | 12.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 10.08.2022 | |
LT | 10.08.2022 | ||
NL | 10.08.2022 | ||
RS | 10.08.2022 | ||
SE | 10.08.2022 | ||
NO | 10.11.2022 | Cited in | Examination | DE102012206441 |