EP3319865 - AUXILIARY FRAME FOR MOTOR VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.03.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.04.2020 [2020/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KSM Castings Group GmbH Cheruskerring 38 31137 Hildesheim / DE | [2018/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAUERT, Heiko Mittelstrasse 18 16321 Bernau / DE | 02 /
LACHMUND, Heik Kupferweg 26 31188 Holle / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/20] | 01 /
KAUERT, Heiko Ebereschenring 33 15827 Blankenfelde / DE | ||
02 /
LACHMUND, Heik Kupferweg 26 31188 Holle / DE | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Thömen & Körner Zeppelinstraße 5 30175 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/20] | Patentanwälte Thömen & Körner Zeppelinstrasse 5 30175 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 16750366.3 | 20.06.2016 | [2018/20] | WO2016DE100278 | Priority number, date | DE201510111219 | 10.07.2015 Original published format: DE102015111219 | DE201610102039 | 05.02.2016 Original published format: DE102016102039 | [2018/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017008783 | Date: | 19.01.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3319865 | Date: | 16.05.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B62D21/11, B62D29/00 | [2018/20] | CPC: |
B62D21/11 (EP,CN,US);
B60K1/00 (US);
B60K17/00 (US);
B62D29/008 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/20] | Title | German: | HILFSRAHMEN FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE | [2018/20] | English: | AUXILIARY FRAME FOR MOTOR VEHICLES | [2018/20] | French: | FAUX-CHASSIS POUR VÉHICULE À MOTEUR | [2018/20] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/20] | 22.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |