EP3334377 - REPLACEMENT HEART VALVE IMPLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.2021 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.07.2021 [2021/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Scimed Inc. One Scimed Place Maple Grove, Minnesota 55311 / US | [2018/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BACKUS, Andrew J.H. 2012 Fell Street San Francisco, California 94117 / US | 02 /
SALAHIEH, Ali 18705 Metler Court Saratoga, California 95070 / US | 03 /
CROWLEY, Cornelius M. 2816 Pacheco Street San Francisco, California 94116 / US | [2018/25] | Representative(s) | Peterreins Schley Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Hermann-Sack-Straße 3 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/25] | Peterreins Schley Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hermann-Sack-Strasse 3 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16750589.0 | 03.08.2016 | [2018/25] | WO2016US45335 | Priority number, date | US201562204073P | 12.08.2015 Original published format: US 201562204073 P | US201615219682 | 26.07.2016 Original published format: US201615219682 | [2018/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017027289 | Date: | 16.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3334377 | Date: | 20.06.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/24 | [2018/25] | CPC: |
A61F2/2418 (EP,US);
A61F2/2409 (US);
A61F2220/0075 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0007 (EP,US);
A61F2250/001 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0069 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/25] | Title | German: | HERZKLAPPENIMPLANTAT FÜR HERZKLAPPENERSATZ | [2018/25] | English: | REPLACEMENT HEART VALVE IMPLANT | [2018/25] | French: | IMPLANT DE VALVULE CARDIAQUE DE REMPLACEMENT | [2018/25] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/25] | 07.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/30] | 23.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2020 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2009076598 (SALAHIEH AMR [US], et al) [Y] 1-24 * paragraphs [0105] , [0111] - [0112]; figures 14,17A,17B,18A,18B,27-33 *; | [Y]WO2013009975 (BOSTON SCIENT SCIMED INC [US]) [Y] 1-24 * figures 5-7 *; | [Y]WO2013028387 (TENDYNE HOLDINGS INC [US]) [Y] 8,13-15 * paragraph [0336] - paragraph [0420]; figures 1-16 *; | [E]WO2016126511 (BOSTON SCIENT SCIMED INC [US]) [E] 1-7,17-24* page 7 - page 18; figures 1A,1B,4F,4G,5A-5C * |