EP3320503 - ACTIVE PERIPHERAL DEVICE AND ELECTRONIC PAYMENT TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roam Data Inc. 108 West 13th Street New Castle (Comté) Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | [2018/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROTSAERT, Christopher 37 Rue Montesquieu 59290 Wasquehal / FR | [2018/20] | Representative(s) | Vidon Brevets & Stratégie 16B, rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | [2018/20] | Application number, filing date | 16751014.8 | 26.07.2016 | [2018/20] | WO2016IB54465 | Priority number, date | FR20150056596 | 10.07.2015 Original published format: FR 1556596 | [2018/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017009816 | Date: | 19.01.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3320503 | Date: | 16.05.2018 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q20/34, G07F7/08 | [2022/13] | CPC: |
G06Q20/352 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3278 (US);
G07F7/0873 (EP,US);
G07F7/0893 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/20] | G06Q20/34, G07F7/08, G06K7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/20] | Title | German: | AKTIVE PERIPHERIEVORRICHTUNG UND ELEKTRONISCHES ZAHLUNGSENDGERÄT | [2018/20] | English: | ACTIVE PERIPHERAL DEVICE AND ELECTRONIC PAYMENT TERMINAL | [2018/20] | French: | DISPOSITIF PÉRIPHÉRIQUE ACTIF ET TERMINAL DE PAIEMENT ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2018/20] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2017 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/20] | 04.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/25] | 19.02.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2023 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2795845 (WYNID TECHNOLOGIES SA [FR]) [A] 1-7* page 2, line 19 - page 3, line 9 *; | [I]US2005156026 (GHOSH ANGANA [US], et al) [I] 1-7 * paragraph [0019]; figure 1 *; | [XI]DE102007028100 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5 * paragraphs [0052] - [0055]; figures 3,8 * [I] 1-7; | [XI]WO2013132426 (FUNDAMO PTY LTD [ZA]) [X] 1,2,5 * paragraphs [0005] , [0008] , [0012] , [0016] , [0044] - [0047] - [0072]; figures 1,2,7 * [I] 1-7 |