Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017020041 | ![]() | 02.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662288755 | 29.01.2016 | US201514814232 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814363 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814274 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814335 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814303 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814293 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814319 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814181 | 30.07.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017020040 | ![]() | 09.03.2017 | A3 | WO2017020040 | 02.02.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201514814232 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814363 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814274 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814335 | 30.07.2015 | US201662288851 | 29.01.2016 | US201514814303 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814293 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814319 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814181 | 30.07.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017019851 | ![]() | 02.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514814232 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814363 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814274 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814335 | 30.07.2015 | US201662288851 | 29.01.2016 | US201562236296 | 02.10.2015 | US201514814303 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814293 | 30.07.2015 | US201662281971 | 22.01.2016 | US201514814319 | 30.07.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017019840 | ![]() | 02.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514814232 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814363 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814274 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814335 | 30.07.2015 | US201662288851 | 29.01.2016 | US201562236296 | 02.10.2015 | US201514814303 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814293 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814319 | 30.07.2015 | US201662286192 | 22.01.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016019171 | ![]() | 04.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462031856 | 31.07.2014 | US201462074838 | 04.11.2014 | US201562147289 | 14.04.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016019167 | ![]() | 04.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462031856 | 31.07.2014 | US201462074838 | 04.11.2014 | US201562147289 | 14.04.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015030969 | ![]() | 29.10.2015 | A3 | WO2015030969 | 05.03.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201361870300 | 27.08.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024140852 | ![]() | 02.05.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514814232 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814363 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814274 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814335 | 30.07.2015 | WO2016US44406 | 28.07.2016 | US201514814293 | 30.07.2015 | US201662286192 | 22.01.2016 | US201815749015 | 30.01.2018 | US202117380461 | 20.07.2021 | US202418403845 | 04.01.2024 | US201562236296 | 02.10.2015 | US201514814303 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814319 | 30.07.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019002330 | ![]() | 03.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514814232 | 30.07.2015 | US201361870300 | 27.08.2013 | US201514814363 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814274 | 30.07.2015 | WO2016US44445 | 28.07.2016 | WO2014US48373 | 28.07.2014 | US201514814293 | 30.07.2015 | US201662288851 | 29.01.2016 | US201562236296 | 02.10.2015 | US201462031856 | 31.07.2014 | US201615749005 | 28.07.2016 | US201514814303 | 30.07.2015 | US201462074838 | 04.11.2014 | US201562147289 | 14.04.2015 | US201662281971 | 22.01.2016 | US201514814319 | 30.07.2015 | US201614914335 | 25.02.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019002329 | ![]() | 03.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514814232 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814363 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814274 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814335 | 30.07.2015 | US201615748993 | 01.08.2016 | WO2016US45022 | 01.08.2016 | US201514814293 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814181 | 30.07.2015 | US201662288851 | 29.01.2016 | US201462031856 | 31.07.2014 | US201514814303 | 30.07.2015 | US201462074838 | 04.11.2014 | US201562147289 | 14.04.2015 | US201514814319 | 30.07.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016203464 | ![]() | 14.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361870300 | 27.08.2013 | US201414914335 | 28.07.2014 | WO2014US48373 | 28.07.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9783448 | ![]() | 10.10.2017 | B2 | US2016031753 | 04.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462031856 | 31.07.2014 | US201514814303 | 30.07.2015 | US201462074838 | 04.11.2014 | US201562147289 | 14.04.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016031752 | ![]() | 04.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462031856 | 31.07.2014 | US201462074838 | 04.11.2014 | US201562147289 | 14.04.2015 | US201514814181 | 30.07.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9975801 | ![]() | 22.05.2018 | B2 | US2016031742 | 04.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462031856 | 31.07.2014 | US201462074838 | 04.11.2014 | US201562147289 | 14.04.2015 | US201514814319 | 30.07.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9802853 | ![]() | 31.10.2017 | B2 | US2016031741 | 04.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462031856 | 31.07.2014 | US201462074838 | 04.11.2014 | US201562147289 | 14.04.2015 | US201514814293 | 30.07.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9776905 | ![]() | 03.10.2017 | B2 | US2016031740 | 04.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514814274 | 30.07.2015 | US201462031856 | 31.07.2014 | US201462074838 | 04.11.2014 | US201562147289 | 14.04.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9296638 | ![]() | 29.03.2016 | B2 | US2016031739 | 04.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514814232 | 30.07.2015 | US201462031856 | 31.07.2014 | US201462074838 | 04.11.2014 | US201562147289 | 14.04.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11891324 | ![]() | 06.02.2024 | B2 | US2021347672 | 11.11.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514814232 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814363 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814274 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814335 | 30.07.2015 | US201615749015 | 28.07.2016 | WO2016US44406 | 28.07.2016 | US201514814293 | 30.07.2015 | US201662286192 | 22.01.2016 | US202117380461 | 20.07.2021 | US201662288851 | 29.01.2016 | US201562236296 | 02.10.2015 | US201462031856 | 31.07.2014 | US201514814303 | 30.07.2015 | US201462074838 | 04.11.2014 | US201562147289 | 14.04.2015 | US201514814319 | 30.07.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11097974 | ![]() | 24.08.2021 | B2 | US2019002331 | 03.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514814232 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814363 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814274 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814335 | 30.07.2015 | US201615749015 | 28.07.2016 | WO2016US44406 | 28.07.2016 | US201514814293 | 30.07.2015 | US201662286192 | 22.01.2016 | US201662288851 | 29.01.2016 | US201562236296 | 02.10.2015 | US201462031856 | 31.07.2014 | US201514814303 | 30.07.2015 | US201462074838 | 04.11.2014 | US201562147289 | 14.04.2015 | US201514814319 | 30.07.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10611664 | ![]() | 07.04.2020 | B2 | US2019002328 | 03.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514814232 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814363 | 30.07.2015 | WO2016US44401 | 28.07.2016 | US201514814274 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814335 | 30.07.2015 | US201615748992 | 28.07.2016 | US201514814293 | 30.07.2015 | US201662288669 | 29.01.2016 | US201662288851 | 29.01.2016 | US201562236296 | 02.10.2015 | US201462031856 | 31.07.2014 | US201514814303 | 30.07.2015 | US201462074838 | 04.11.2014 | US201562147289 | 14.04.2015 | US201514814319 | 30.07.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10233111 | ![]() | 19.03.2019 | B2 | US2016207821 | 21.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514814232 | 30.07.2015 | US201615082872 | 28.03.2016 | US201462031856 | 31.07.2014 | US201462074838 | 04.11.2014 | US201562147289 | 14.04.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10077204 | ![]() | 18.09.2018 | B2 | US2016031743 | 04.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514814335 | 30.07.2015 | US201462031856 | 31.07.2014 | US201462074838 | 04.11.2014 | US201562147289 | 14.04.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10005691 | ![]() | 26.06.2018 | B2 | US2016031744 | 04.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514814363 | 30.07.2015 | US201462031856 | 31.07.2014 | US201462074838 | 04.11.2014 | US201562147289 | 14.04.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20180036746 | ![]() | 09.04.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201514814232 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814363 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814274 | 30.07.2015 | WO2016US44445 | 28.07.2016 | US201514814335 | 30.07.2015 | US201662288851 | 29.01.2016 | US201562236296 | 02.10.2015 | US201514814303 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814293 | 30.07.2015 | US201662281971 | 22.01.2016 | US201514814319 | 30.07.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20180035862 | ![]() | 06.04.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201514814232 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814363 | 30.07.2015 | WO2016US44401 | 28.07.2016 | US201662288669 | 29.01.2016 | US201514814274 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814335 | 30.07.2015 | US201662288851 | 29.01.2016 | US201562236296 | 02.10.2015 | US201514814303 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814293 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814319 | 30.07.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20180033294 | ![]() | 02.04.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201514814232 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814363 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814274 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814335 | 30.07.2015 | US201662288851 | 29.01.2016 | WO2016US45022 | 01.08.2016 | US201514814303 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814293 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814319 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814181 | 30.07.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102544090B | ![]() | 15.06.2023 | B1 | KR20180033583 | 03.04.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201514814232 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814363 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814274 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814335 | 30.07.2015 | US201662288851 | 29.01.2016 | WO2016US44406 | 28.07.2016 | US201562236296 | 02.10.2015 | US201514814303 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814293 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814319 | 30.07.2015 | US201662286192 | 22.01.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102454959B | ![]() | 14.10.2022 | B1 | KR20170036091 | 31.03.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201462031856 | 31.07.2014 | US201462074838 | 04.11.2014 | US201562147289 | 14.04.2015 | WO2015US42955 | 30.07.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6749997B | ![]() | 02.09.2020 | B2 | JP2018531861 | 01.11.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201514814232 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814363 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814274 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814335 | 30.07.2015 | US201662288851 | 29.01.2016 | WO2016US44406 | 28.07.2016 | US201562236296 | 02.10.2015 | US201514814303 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814293 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814319 | 30.07.2015 | US201662286192 | 22.01.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2018529611 | ![]() | 11.10.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201514814232 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814363 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814274 | 30.07.2015 | WO2016US44445 | 28.07.2016 | US201514814335 | 30.07.2015 | US201662288851 | 29.01.2016 | US201562236296 | 02.10.2015 | US201514814303 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814293 | 30.07.2015 | US201662281971 | 22.01.2016 | US201514814319 | 30.07.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2018528918 | ![]() | 04.10.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201514814232 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814363 | 30.07.2015 | WO2016US44401 | 28.07.2016 | US201662288669 | 29.01.2016 | US201514814274 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814335 | 30.07.2015 | US201662288851 | 29.01.2016 | US201562236296 | 02.10.2015 | US201514814303 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814293 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814319 | 30.07.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2018526314 | ![]() | 13.09.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201514814232 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814363 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814274 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814335 | 30.07.2015 | US201662288851 | 29.01.2016 | WO2016US45022 | 01.08.2016 | US201514814303 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814293 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814319 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814181 | 30.07.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6701168B | ![]() | 27.05.2020 | B2 | JP2017523114 | 17.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201462031856 | 31.07.2014 | US201462074838 | 04.11.2014 | US201562147289 | 14.04.2015 | WO2015US42955 | 30.07.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3365750 | ![]() | 29.08.2018 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201514814232 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814363 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814274 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814335 | 30.07.2015 | US201662288851 | 29.01.2016 | WO2016US45022 | 01.08.2016 | US201514814303 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814293 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814319 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814181 | 30.07.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3329348 | ![]() | 06.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514814232 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814363 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814274 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814335 | 30.07.2015 | US201662288851 | 29.01.2016 | WO2016US44406 | 28.07.2016 | US201562236296 | 02.10.2015 | US201514814303 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814293 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814319 | 30.07.2015 | US201662286192 | 22.01.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3328803 | ![]() | 06.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514814232 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814363 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814274 | 30.07.2015 | WO2016US44445 | 28.07.2016 | US201514814335 | 30.07.2015 | US201662288851 | 29.01.2016 | US201562236296 | 02.10.2015 | US201514814303 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814293 | 30.07.2015 | US201662281971 | 22.01.2016 | US201514814319 | 30.07.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3174835 | ![]() | 07.06.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462031856 | 31.07.2014 | US201462074838 | 04.11.2014 | US201562147289 | 14.04.2015 | WO2015US42955 | 30.07.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113620577B | ![]() | 01.11.2022 | B | CN113620577 | 09.11.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201514814232 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814363 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814274 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814335 | 30.07.2015 | US201662288851 | 29.01.2016 | WO2016US44406 | 28.07.2016 | US201562236296 | 02.10.2015 | US201514814303 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814293 | 30.07.2015 | CN201680054630 | 28.07.2016 | US201514814319 | 30.07.2015 | US201662286192 | 22.01.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113233755B | ![]() | 27.06.2023 | B | CN113233755 | 10.08.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201580053189 | 30.07.2015 | US201462031856 | 31.07.2014 | CN202110505476 | 30.07.2015 | US201462074838 | 04.11.2014 | US201562147289 | 14.04.2015 | WO2015US42955 | 30.07.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108883977 | ![]() | 23.11.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201514814232 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814363 | 30.07.2015 | WO2016US44401 | 28.07.2016 | US201662288669 | 29.01.2016 | US201514814274 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814335 | 30.07.2015 | US201662288851 | 29.01.2016 | US201562236296 | 02.10.2015 | US201514814303 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814293 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814319 | 30.07.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108431726 | ![]() | 21.08.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201514814232 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814363 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814274 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814335 | 30.07.2015 | US201662288851 | 29.01.2016 | WO2016US45022 | 01.08.2016 | US201514814303 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814293 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814319 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814181 | 30.07.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108431725B | ![]() | 13.08.2021 | B | CN108431725 | 21.08.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201514814232 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814363 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814274 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814335 | 30.07.2015 | US201662288851 | 29.01.2016 | WO2016US44406 | 28.07.2016 | US201562236296 | 02.10.2015 | US201514814303 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814293 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814319 | 30.07.2015 | US201662286192 | 22.01.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108025939 | ![]() | 11.05.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201514814232 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814363 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814274 | 30.07.2015 | WO2016US44445 | 28.07.2016 | US201514814335 | 30.07.2015 | US201662288851 | 29.01.2016 | US201562236296 | 02.10.2015 | US201514814303 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814293 | 30.07.2015 | US201662281971 | 22.01.2016 | US201514814319 | 30.07.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106795036B | ![]() | 28.05.2021 | B | CN106795036 | 31.05.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201462031856 | 31.07.2014 | US201462074838 | 04.11.2014 | US201562147289 | 14.04.2015 | WO2015US42955 | 30.07.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105637569 | ![]() | 01.06.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361870300 | 27.08.2013 | WO2014US48373 | 28.07.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2994284 | ![]() | 02.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514814232 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814363 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814274 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814335 | 30.07.2015 | US201662288851 | 29.01.2016 | WO2016US45022 | 01.08.2016 | US201514814303 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814293 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814319 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814181 | 30.07.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2994236 | ![]() | 02.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514814232 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814363 | 30.07.2015 | WO2016US44401 | 28.07.2016 | US201662288669 | 29.01.2016 | US201514814274 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814335 | 30.07.2015 | US201662288851 | 29.01.2016 | US201562236296 | 02.10.2015 | US201514814303 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814293 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814319 | 30.07.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2956929 | ![]() | 04.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462031856 | 31.07.2014 | US201462074838 | 04.11.2014 | US201562147289 | 14.04.2015 | WO2015US42955 | 30.07.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2019246778 | ![]() | 31.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462031856 | 31.07.2014 | US201462074838 | 04.11.2014 | US201562147289 | 14.04.2015 | AU2019246778 | 08.10.2019 | WO2015US42955 | 30.07.2015 | AU2015296243 | 30.07.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2015296243 | ![]() | 09.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201462031856 | 31.07.2014 | US201462074838 | 04.11.2014 | US201562147289 | 14.04.2015 | WO2015US42955 | 30.07.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3328807 | ![]() | 06.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514814232 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814363 | 30.07.2015 | WO2016US44401 | 28.07.2016 | US201662288669 | 29.01.2016 | US201514814274 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814335 | 30.07.2015 | US201662288851 | 29.01.2016 | US201562236296 | 02.10.2015 | US201514814303 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814293 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814319 | 30.07.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112017002106 | 21.11.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201462031856 | 31.07.2014 | US201462074838 | 04.11.2014 | US201562147289 | 14.04.2015 | WO2015US42955 | 30.07.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112018002058 | 18.09.2018 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201514814232 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814363 | 30.07.2015 | WO2016US44401 | 28.07.2016 | US201662288669 | 29.01.2016 | US201514814274 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814335 | 30.07.2015 | US201662288851 | 29.01.2016 | US201562236296 | 02.10.2015 | US201514814303 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814293 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814319 | 30.07.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112018002063 | 18.09.2018 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201514814232 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814363 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814274 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814335 | 30.07.2015 | US201662288851 | 29.01.2016 | WO2016US45022 | 01.08.2016 | US201514814303 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814293 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814319 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814181 | 30.07.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX373012 | 15.04.2020 | B | MX2016002466 | 11.08.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361870300 | 27.08.2013 | WO2014US48373 | 28.07.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2017001386 | 21.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201462031856 | 31.07.2014 | US201462074838 | 04.11.2014 | US201562147289 | 14.04.2015 | WO2015US42955 | 30.07.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2018001302 | 12.11.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201514814232 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814363 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814274 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814335 | 30.07.2015 | US201662288851 | 29.01.2016 | WO2016US45022 | 01.08.2016 | US201514814303 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814293 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814319 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814181 | 30.07.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI679176B | 11.12.2019 | B | TW201623168 | 01.07.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201462031856 | 31.07.2014 | US201462074838 | 04.11.2014 | US201562147289 | 14.04.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW201623169 | 01.07.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201462031856 | 31.07.2014 | US201462074838 | 04.11.2014 | US201562147289 | 14.04.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW202023975 | 01.07.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201462031856 | 31.07.2014 | US201462074838 | 04.11.2014 | US201562147289 | 14.04.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017019837 | ![]() | 02.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514814232 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814363 | 30.07.2015 | US201662288669 | 29.01.2016 | US201514814274 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814335 | 30.07.2015 | US201662288851 | 29.01.2016 | US201562236296 | 02.10.2015 | US201514814303 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814293 | 30.07.2015 | US201514814319 | 30.07.2015 |