EP3374044 - PROTECTION DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT SPORTS ACTIVITIES USABLE IN A DATA ANALYSIS AND MONITORING SYSTEM, AND RELATIVE SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING AND CALCULATING THE SENT DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.09.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GHST World Inc. 667 Madison Avenue, 5th floor New York, NY 10065 / US | [2023/09] |
Former [2018/38] | For all designated states GHST World Inc. 37 Park Avenue, Suite 2607 New York, NY 10152 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAGLIERANI, Pietro 10065 New York / US | 02 /
BIANCALANA, Alberto 10065 New York / US | 03 /
LA VECCHIA, Giustiniano 10065 New York / US | 04 /
BANCHINI, Marco 10065 New York / US | [2023/09] |
Former [2018/52] | 01 /
PAGLIERANI, Pietro c/o GHST WORLD INC. 375 Park Avenue, Suite 2607 10152 New York / US | ||
02 /
BIANCALANA, Alberto c/o GHST WORLD INC. 375 Park Avenue, Suite 2607 10152 New York / US | |||
03 /
LA VECCHIA, Giustiniano c/o GHST WORLD INC. 375 Park Avenue, Suite 2607 10152 New York / US | |||
04 /
BANCHINI, Marco c/o GHST WORLD INC. 375 Park Avenue, Suite 2607 10152 New York / US | |||
Former [2018/38] | 01 /
PAGLIERANI, Pietro c/o Zero SA Via Livio 8 6830 Chiasso / CH | ||
02 /
BIANCALANA, Alberto c/o Zero SA Via Livio 8 6830 Chiasso / CH | |||
03 /
LA VECCHIA, Giustiniano c/o Zero SA Via Livio 8 6830 Chiasso / CH | |||
04 /
BANCHINI, Marco c/o Zero SA Via Livio, 8 6830 Chiasso / CH | Representative(s) | Brunacci, Marco BRUNACCI & PARTNERS S.r.l. Via Pietro Giardini, 625 41125 Modena (MO) / IT | [2023/10] |
Former [2018/38] | Brunacci, Marco BRUNACCI & PARTNERS S.r.l. Via Scaglia Est, 19-31 41126 Modena / IT | Application number, filing date | 16751654.1 | 13.07.2016 | [2018/38] | WO2016IB54182 | Priority number, date | IT2015UB05574 | 13.11.2015 Original published format: IT UB20155574 | [2018/38] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017081555 | Date: | 18.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3374044 | Date: | 19.09.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3374044 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A63B71/12, A63B24/00 | [2018/38] | CPC: |
A63B71/1225 (EP,US);
A63B24/0021 (US);
A63B71/12 (EP,US);
A63B2024/0025 (EP,US);
A63B2024/0056 (EP,US);
A63B2071/125 (EP,US);
A63B2071/1258 (EP,US);
A63B2220/12 (EP,US);
A63B2220/30 (EP,US);
A63B2220/40 (EP,US);
A63B2220/836 (EP,US);
A63B2225/20 (EP,US);
A63B2225/50 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPORTLERSCHUTZVORRICHTUNG, DIE IN EINEM SYSTEM ZUR DATEN-ÜBERWACHUNG UND ANALYSE EINSETZBAR IST, SOWIE ENTSPRECHENDES SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG UND BERECHNUNG DER GESENDETEN DATEN | [2022/42] | English: | PROTECTION DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT SPORTS ACTIVITIES USABLE IN A DATA ANALYSIS AND MONITORING SYSTEM, AND RELATIVE SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING AND CALCULATING THE SENT DATA | [2018/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION POUR LA PRATIQUE SPORTIVE UTILISABLE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE SURVEILLANCE ET D'ANALYSE, ET SYSTÈME ET MÉTHODE CORRESPONDANTS POUR LE TRAITEMENT ET LE CALCUL DES DONNÉES ENVOYÉES. | [2022/42] |
Former [2018/38] | SCHUTZVORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG VON IN EINEM DATENANALYSE- UND ÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM VERWENDBAREN SPORTLICHEN AKTIVITÄTEN UND ENTSPRECHENDES SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG UND BERECHNUNG DER GESENDETEN DATEN | ||
Former [2018/38] | DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION PERMETTANT DE RÉALISER DES ACTIVITÉS SPORTIVES ET POUVANT ÊTRE UTILISÉ DANS UN SYSTÈME D'ANALYSE ET DE SURVEILLANCE DE DONNÉES, ET SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉS PERMETTANT DE TRAITER ET DE CALCULER LES DONNÉES ENVOYÉES | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/38] | 12.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2018 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   10.09.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.03.2023 | CZ | 08.03.2023 | DK | 08.03.2023 | EE | 08.03.2023 | FI | 08.03.2023 | HR | 08.03.2023 | LT | 08.03.2023 | LV | 08.03.2023 | MC | 08.03.2023 | NL | 08.03.2023 | PL | 08.03.2023 | RO | 08.03.2023 | RS | 08.03.2023 | SE | 08.03.2023 | SI | 08.03.2023 | SK | 08.03.2023 | SM | 08.03.2023 | NO | 08.06.2023 | GR | 09.06.2023 | IS | 08.07.2023 | PT | 10.07.2023 | IE | 13.07.2023 | LU | 13.07.2023 | BE | 31.07.2023 | CH | 31.07.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/24] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
DK | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
MC | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SI | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
LU | 13.07.2023 | ||
BE | 31.07.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/18] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
DK | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
MC | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SI | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
LU | 13.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
DK | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
MC | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SI | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
DK | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SI | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
PL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SK | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
IS | 08.07.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
CZ | 08.03.2023 | ||
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RO | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 08.03.2023 | |
EE | 08.03.2023 | ||
FI | 08.03.2023 | ||
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | FI | 08.03.2023 | |
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
SM | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
PT | 10.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | FI | 08.03.2023 | |
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
NL | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 08.03.2023 | |
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
GR | 09.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 08.03.2023 | |
HR | 08.03.2023 | ||
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
LV | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
SE | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 08.03.2023 | |
LT | 08.03.2023 | ||
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
NO | 08.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 08.03.2023 | |
RS | 08.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 08.03.2023 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP1992389 (MNT INNOVATIONS PTY LTD [AU]) [Y] 1-24 * figure -; claim - *; | [Y]WO2009067837 (HAENGGI STEFAN [CH]) [Y] 6,18* page 7, lines 172-178; figure - *; | [Y]US2010030482 (LI XIPU [US]) [Y] 6-14,18-24 * paragraphs [0010] , [0 32] , [0 55] - [0056]; figure - *; | [Y]KR20100032273 (HONG SUNG KI [KR]) [Y] 1-24 * paragraphs [0010] - [0040]; figure -; claim - *; | [Y]WO2011096793 (DOLCETTI JOSEPH CLEARY [MY]) [Y] 1-24 * pages 6-12; figure - *; | [XY]WO2015092533 (XMETRICS SPORTS LTD [GB]) [X] 1-5,15-17 * pages 6-15; figure - * [Y] 6-14,18-24; | [Y] - Pham Duy Duong and Young Soo Suh, "Foot Pose Estimation Using an Inertial Sensor Unit and Two Distance Sensors", (20150703), URL: https://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC4541859/, (20161004), XP002762515 [Y] 7-17,19-24 * the whole document * | Examination | WO2015169915 |