EP3332383 - APPARATUS, METHOD AND ARTICLE FOR ELECTRIC VEHICLE SHARING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gogoro Inc. 3806 Central Plaza 18 Harbour Road Wanchai, Hong Kong / CN | [2023/19] |
Former [2018/24] | For all designated states Gogoro Inc. 3806 Central Plaza 18 Harbour Road Wanchai, Hong Kong / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUKE, Hok-Sum Horace 3763 77th Place Southeast Mercer Island, Washington 98040 / US | 02 /
TAYLOR, Matthew Whiting 15135 Uplands Way Southeast North Bend, Washington 98045 / US | 03 /
WALL, Kenneth Edward 410 Hudson Farm Road Greer, South Carolina 29650 / US | [2018/24] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2023/19] |
Former [2018/24] | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 16751772.1 | 04.08.2016 | [2018/24] | WO2016US45625 | Priority number, date | US201562201072P | 04.08.2015 Original published format: US 201562201072 P | [2018/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017024168 | Date: | 09.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3332383 | Date: | 13.06.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3332383 | Date: | 10.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q50/00 | [2018/24] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0645 (EP,US);
B60L53/80 (EP,US);
G06Q20/102 (US);
G06Q50/00 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
Y02T10/7072 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN UND ARTIKEL FÜR GEMEINSAME NUTZUNG EINES ELEKTROFAHRZEUGES | [2018/24] | English: | APPARATUS, METHOD AND ARTICLE FOR ELECTRIC VEHICLE SHARING | [2018/24] | French: | APPAREIL, PROCÉDÉ ET ARTICLE POUR PARTAGE DE VÉHICULE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2018/24] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/24] | 07.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.12.2022 | 12.12.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 25.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.05.2023 | CZ | 10.05.2023 | DK | 10.05.2023 | EE | 10.05.2023 | FI | 10.05.2023 | HR | 10.05.2023 | LT | 10.05.2023 | LV | 10.05.2023 | MC | 10.05.2023 | NL | 10.05.2023 | PL | 10.05.2023 | RO | 10.05.2023 | RS | 10.05.2023 | SE | 10.05.2023 | SI | 10.05.2023 | SK | 10.05.2023 | SM | 10.05.2023 | IE | 04.08.2023 | LU | 04.08.2023 | GB | 10.08.2023 | NO | 10.08.2023 | GR | 11.08.2023 | BE | 31.08.2023 | CH | 31.08.2023 | IS | 10.09.2023 | PT | 11.09.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/33] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
MC | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SI | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
IE | 04.08.2023 | ||
LU | 04.08.2023 | ||
GB | 10.08.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
MC | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SI | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
LU | 04.08.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
MC | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
LU | 04.08.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/16] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
MC | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
CZ | 10.05.2023 | ||
DK | 10.05.2023 | ||
EE | 10.05.2023 | ||
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RO | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
SK | 10.05.2023 | ||
SM | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
FI | 10.05.2023 | ||
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
LT | 10.05.2023 | ||
LV | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
HR | 10.05.2023 | ||
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
RS | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
PL | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
GR | 11.08.2023 | ||
IS | 10.09.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 10.05.2023 | |
NL | 10.05.2023 | ||
SE | 10.05.2023 | ||
NO | 10.08.2023 | ||
PT | 11.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | PT | 11.09.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2011060480 (MOTTLA LESLEY [US], et al) [A] 1-46 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0009] ** paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0040] *; | [I]US2011071932 (AGASSI SHAI [US], et al) [I] 1-46 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0083] - paragraph [0216] *; | [I]US2012316671 (HAMMERSLAG JULIUS G [US], et al) [I] 1-46 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0108] * | Examination | WO2010033517 | US2012232964 | US2012248868 | US2012306618 | US2013311003 | US2015126176 |