EP3236274 - ELECTRIC ARC DETECTION DEVICE AND ELECTRIC ARC DETECTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Omron Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [2017/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOMITA, Kohei c/o OMRON CORPORATION 801 Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | 02 /
FUJII, Toru c/o OMRON CORPORATION 801 Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | 03 /
HATTORI, Reiko c/o OMRON CORPORATION 801 Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | 04 /
ASHIDA, Takeshi c/o OMRON CORPORATION 801 Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [2017/43] | Representative(s) | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Schmid-Dreyer Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theresienhöhe 12 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/43] | Horn Kleimann Waitzhofer Patentanwälte PartG mbB Ganghoferstrasse 29a 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16752170.7 | 14.01.2016 | [2017/43] | WO2016JP50952 | Priority number, date | JP20150029790 | 18.02.2015 Original published format: JP 2015029790 | [2017/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016132781 | Date: | 25.08.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3236274 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.08.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/12, H02S50/00, H02H1/00, // G01R31/40 | [2018/14] | CPC: |
G01R31/1227 (EP,US);
H02H1/0015 (US);
G01R31/08 (US);
H01L31/02021 (US);
H02H3/10 (US);
H02H3/32 (US);
H02H7/20 (US);
H02S50/00 (EP,US);
G01R31/40 (EP,US);
Y02E10/50 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/43] | G01R31/00, H02S50/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/43] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERFASSUNG EINES LICHTBOGENS UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERFASSUNG EINES LICHTBOGENS | [2017/43] | English: | ELECTRIC ARC DETECTION DEVICE AND ELECTRIC ARC DETECTION METHOD | [2017/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION D'ARC ÉLECTRIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION D'ARC ÉLECTRIQUE | [2017/43] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2017 | Translation filed | 20.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2017 | Search fee paid | 20.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/43] | 20.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/52] | 24.08.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2023 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]US2012316804 (OBERHAUSER CHRISTOPHER A [US]) [X] 1,5,11,12 * paragraphs [0007] , [0021] , [0022] , [0026] - paragraph [0030]; figures 1,2,6-8 * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0049] * [A] 8-10 [Y] 2,4,6,13 [I] 3,7; | [IAY]JP2014134445 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [I] 1-7,12,13 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0020]; figure 1 * [A] 8-10 [Y] 2,4,6,13; | [A]DE10359532 (FACHHOCHSCHULE DORTMUND [DE]) [A] 1,12 * paragraphs [0024] , [0025] , [0038] - paragraph [0040]; figure 2 *; | [A]CN102854426 (SHAO JUNSONG) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]DE10318951 (HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO [DE]) [A] 2,13 * abstract * | International search | [YA]JP2014134445 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 1, 3-7, 11-12 * , paragraphs [0001], [0006] to [0007], [0010] to [0023]; fig. 1, 4, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9 (Family: none) * [A] 2, 8-10, 13; | [YA]US2012316804 (OBERHAUSER CHRISTOPHER A [US]) [Y] 1, 3-7, 11-12 * , fig. 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 12; paragraphs [0002] to [0007], [0020] to [0064] (Family: none) * [A] 2, 8-10, 13; | [Y]JPH04147066 (TOSHIBA CORP) [Y] 6-7, 11 * , page 1, lower left column, line 17 to page 2, upper right column, line 13; page 3, lower left column, line 18 to page 4, upper left column, line 18; fig. 1, 2, 3 (Family: none) * |