EP3259926 - PERSONALIZED HEADPHONES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.10.2019 [2019/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Harman International Industries, Incorporated 400 Atlantic Street, 15th Floor Stamford, CT 06901 / US | [2017/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KONJETI, Srikanth No. 9, A Block, 1st Main, 5th Cross Vinayaknager Bangalore 560017 / IN | 02 /
HAMPIHOLI, Vallabha Vasant Accord-104, HM Symphony Kasavanahalli Off Sarjapur Road Bangalore 560035 / IN | 03 /
VENKAT, Karthik 308, Abhinand Gardenia Garden School Road Manjunatha Nagara Chikkallasnadra, Bengaluru 560061 / IN | [2017/52] | Representative(s) | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Werinherstrasse 79 81541 München / DE | [2017/52] | Application number, filing date | 16752797.7 | 08.02.2016 | [2017/52] | WO2016US16993 | Priority number, date | US201514627461 | 20.02.2015 Original published format: US201514627461 | [2017/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016133727 | Date: | 25.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3259926 | Date: | 27.12.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.08.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04R5/033, H04R1/10, // H04R5/04 | [2018/42] | CPC: |
H04R1/1041 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04R1/1091 (CN,KR,US);
H04R5/033 (EP,KR,US);
H04R2430/01 (EP,KR,US);
H04R2460/07 (KR);
H04R5/04 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/52] | H04R1/10, H04R5/033 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/52] | Title | German: | PERSONALISIERTE KOPFHÖRER | [2017/52] | English: | PERSONALIZED HEADPHONES | [2017/52] | French: | ÉCOUTEURS PERSONNALISÉS | [2017/52] | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2017 | Search fee paid | 26.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/52] | 26.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/41] | 22.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2013177166 (AGEVIK MARKUS [SE], et al) [X] 8,10,13 * paragraphs [0040] - [0059] - [0068] - [0077] - [0 87] * [Y] 7,14 [I] 1-6,9,11,12; | [Y]EP2744226 (OTICON AS [DK]) [Y] 7,14 * paragraph [0029] *; | [Y]US2014362201 (NGUYEN PHUC H [US], et al) [Y] 7,14 * paragraph [0061] * | International search | [X]US2013177166 (AGEVIK MARKUS [SE], et al) [X] 1-21 * See paragraphs [0035]-[0081] and figures 1B-8. *; | [A]US2007092098 (KADERAVEK JOHANN [AT]) [A] 1-21 * See abstract, paragraphs [0034]-[0040] and figure 1. *; | [A]JPH07193899 (SHARP KK) [A] 1-21 * See paragraphs [0038]-[0039] and figures 1-3. *; | [A]US2010310101 (ANDERSON DEAN ROBERT GARY [US]) [A] 1-21 * See paragraphs [0071]-[0076], [0084]-[0094] and figures 2-3, 7. *; | [A]US2012201405 (SLAMKA MILAN [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * See paragraphs [0099]-[0113] and figure 8. * |