EP3337947 - DOWNHOLE COMPLETION SYSTEM SEALING AGAINST THE CAP LAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.02.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Welltec Manufacturing Center Completions ApS Storstrømsvej 12 6715 Esbjerg N / DK | [2024/20] |
Former [2020/17] | For all designated states Welltec Oilfield Solutions AG Baarerstrasse 96 6300 Zug / CH | ||
Former [2019/02] | For all designated states Welltec Oilfield Solutions AG Baarerstrasse 139 6300 Zug / CH | ||
Former [2018/26] | For all designated states Welltec A/S Gydevang 25 3450 Allerød / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAZEL, Paul North Skelmonae Ellon Aberdeen, Aberdeenshire AB41/7JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/26] | 01 /
HAZEL, Paul North Skelmonae Ellon Aberdeen Aberdeenshire AB41/7JQ / GB | Representative(s) | Dragsted Partners A/S Rådhuspladsen 16 1550 Copenhagen V / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2018/26] | Hoffmann Dragsted A/S Rådhuspladsen 16 1550 Copenhagen V / DK | Application number, filing date | 16753374.4 | 17.08.2016 | [2018/26] | WO2016EP69503 | Priority number, date | EP20150181310 | 17.08.2015 Original published format: EP 15181310 | EP20150191258 | 23.10.2015 Original published format: EP 15191258 | [2018/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017029319 | Date: | 23.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3337947 | Date: | 27.06.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | E21B23/06, E21B33/127 | [2018/26] | CPC: |
E21B23/06 (EP,RU,US);
E21B43/105 (US);
E21B23/01 (US);
E21B33/1208 (US);
E21B33/127 (EP,RU,US);
E21B33/1285 (US);
E21B34/10 (US);
E21B47/026 (US);
E21B47/06 (US);
E21B47/07 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/26] | Title | German: | BOHRLOCHVERVOLLSTÄNDIGUNGSSYSTEMABDICHTUNG GEGEN DIE DECKSCHICHT | [2024/33] | English: | DOWNHOLE COMPLETION SYSTEM SEALING AGAINST THE CAP LAYER | [2018/26] | French: | ÉTANCHÉIFICATION D'UN SYSTÈME D'ACHÈVEMENT DE FOND DE TROU PAR RAPPORT À LA COUCHE DE COUVERTURE | [2024/33] |
Former [2018/26] | BOHRLOCHABSCHLUSSSYSTEMABDICHTUNG GEGEN DIE DECKSCHICHT | ||
Former [2018/26] | SYSTÈME DE COMPLÉTION DE FOND DE TROU ASSURANT L'ÉTANCHÉITÉ CONTRE LA COUCHE DE COUVERTURE | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/26] | 01.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.10.2023 | 05.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 02.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP2206879 (WELLTEC AS [DK]); | [A]EP2599956 (WELLTEC AS [DK]); | [XYI]EP2728111 (WELLTEC AS [DK]); | [Y]EP2853681 (WELLTEC AS [DK]) |