EP3350665 - BENDABLE DEVICE WITH DISPLAY IN MOVABLE CONNECTION WITH BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.03.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2021/45] |
Former [2018/30] | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAUHANIEMI, Ilpo Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
MÄÄTTÄ, Esa Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
HYVÖNEN, Lassi Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 04 /
ROPO, Jussi Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 05 /
ALONSO, Vicente Calvo Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 06 /
GHEORGHIU, Catalin Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC Attn: Patent Group Docketing (Bldg. 8/1000) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2018/30] | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [2018/30] | Application number, filing date | 16753531.9 | 05.08.2016 | [2018/30] | WO2016US45668 | Priority number, date | US201514855997 | 16.09.2015 Original published format: US201514855997 | [2018/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017048398 | Date: | 23.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3350665 | Date: | 25.07.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3350665 | Date: | 25.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/16, H04M1/02 | [2018/30] | CPC: |
H04M1/0268 (EP,US);
G06F3/0412 (US);
G06F1/1652 (EP,US);
G09G3/3225 (US);
G06F1/1616 (EP,US);
G06F2203/04102 (US);
G06F2203/04103 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIEGBARE VORRICHTUNG MIT EINER ANZEIGE IN BEWEGLICHER VERBINDUNG MIT DEM KÖRPER | [2018/30] | English: | BENDABLE DEVICE WITH DISPLAY IN MOVABLE CONNECTION WITH BODY | [2018/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF PLIABLE AVEC AFFICHAGE EN CONNEXION SOUPLE AVEC LE CORPS | [2018/30] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2018 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/30] | 12.04.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP2728433 (BLACKBERRY LTD [CA]); | [XI]EP2765479 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [XI]US2015233162 (LEE SANG-CHUL [KR], et al) |