EP3341529 - A ROTARY ACTUATOR FOR AN EXCAVATOR AND USE OF A ROTARY ACTUATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/27] | A ROTARY ACTUATOR FOR AN EXCAVATOR, A METHOD FOR TILTING AN EXCAVATOR TOOL AND USE OF A ROTARY ACTUATOR | ||
[2021/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.06.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TILTMAN APS Snærrildvej 96 8300 Odder / DK | [2018/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ULRIKSEN, Torben Kruse Snærildvej 96 8300 Odder / DK | [2018/27] | Application number, filing date | 16754182.0 | 14.07.2016 | [2018/27] | WO2016DK50252 | Priority number, date | DK20150000496 | 24.08.2015 Original published format: DK 201500496 | [2018/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017032375 | Date: | 02.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3341529 | Date: | 04.07.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3341529 | Date: | 29.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | E02F3/36, F15B15/06 | [2018/27] | CPC: |
E02F3/3681 (EP);
F15B15/068 (EP,US);
E02F3/325 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DREHAKTUATOR FÜR EINEN BAGGER UND VERWENDUNG EINES DREHAKTUATORS | [2021/14] | English: | A ROTARY ACTUATOR FOR AN EXCAVATOR AND USE OF A ROTARY ACTUATOR | [2021/14] | French: | ACTIONNEUR ROTATIF POUR EXCAVATRICE ET UTILISATION D'UN ACTIONNEUR ROTATIF | [2021/14] |
Former [2018/27] | DREHAKTUATOR FÜR EINEN BAGGER, VERFAHREN ZUM KIPPEN EINES BAGGERWERKZEUGS UND VERWENDUNG EINES DREHAKTUATORS | ||
Former [2018/27] | A ROTARY ACTUATOR FOR AN EXCAVATOR, A METHOD FOR TILTING AN EXCAVATOR TOOL AND USE OF A ROTARY ACTUATOR | ||
Former [2018/27] | ACTIONNEUR ROTATIF POUR EXCAVATRICE, PROCÉDÉ D'INCLINAISON D'OUTIL EXCAVATEUR ET UTILISATION D'UN ACTIONNEUR ROTATIF | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/27] | 25.02.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2018 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.09.2018 | 31.07.2019 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   19.09.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.07.2016 | AL | 29.09.2021 | AT | 29.09.2021 | CY | 29.09.2021 | CZ | 29.09.2021 | DK | 29.09.2021 | EE | 29.09.2021 | ES | 29.09.2021 | HR | 29.09.2021 | IT | 29.09.2021 | LT | 29.09.2021 | LV | 29.09.2021 | MC | 29.09.2021 | MK | 29.09.2021 | MT | 29.09.2021 | PL | 29.09.2021 | RO | 29.09.2021 | RS | 29.09.2021 | SI | 29.09.2021 | SK | 29.09.2021 | SM | 29.09.2021 | TR | 29.09.2021 | BG | 29.12.2021 | NO | 29.12.2021 | GR | 30.12.2021 | IS | 29.01.2022 | PT | 31.01.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 14.07.2016 | |
AL | 29.09.2021 | ||
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
CY | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
IT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
MK | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
SM | 29.09.2021 | ||
TR | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 14.07.2016 | |
AL | 29.09.2021 | ||
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
CY | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
IT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
MK | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
SM | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 14.07.2016 | |
AL | 29.09.2021 | ||
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
CY | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
IT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
SM | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 14.07.2016 | |
AL | 29.09.2021 | ||
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
CY | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
IT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 14.07.2016 | |
AL | 29.09.2021 | ||
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
IT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
IT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
IT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 29.09.2021 | |
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 29.09.2021 | |
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 29.09.2021 | |
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | HR | 29.09.2021 | |
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | LT | 29.09.2021 | |
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | LT | 29.09.2021 | |
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 29.09.2021 | |
NO | 29.12.2021 | Cited in | International search | [T]WO8301492 (WEYER PAUL PETER) [T] * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0252423 (WEYER PAUL P) [Y] 6 * column 5, line 12 - line 16; figure 1 *; | [XYI]US5327812 (WEYER PAUL P [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-10 * column 6, line 27 - column 7, line 41; figure 1 * [Y] 6 [I] 3; | [T]US5671652 (WEYER DEAN R [US]) [T] 1-10* the whole document *; | [A]EP2327840 (WEYER DEAN R [US]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0066]; figure 8 *; | [A]WO2011066466 (WEYER DEAN R [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 7, paragraph 4 - page 12, paragraph 2; figure 2 * | by applicant | WO2005026454 | EP1238166 |